EP1262425 - Packaged confectionery combination including confectionery pieces packed tightly in rows and columns and packaging method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.10.2003 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 03.12.2003 [2003/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 1800 Vevey / CH | [2002/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hentzel, Stéphane 73, Union Terrace York YO31 7ES / GB | 02 /
Jones, Karen 61 Millfield Road York YO23 1NH / GB | 03 /
BARRETT, Graham Home Farm YO61 4RH Brandsby / GB | [2003/04] |
Former [2002/49] | 01 /
Hentzel, Stéphane 73, Union Terrace York YO31 7ES / GB | ||
02 /
Jones, Karen 61 Millfield Road York YO23 1NH / GB | Representative(s) | Borne, Patrice Daniel Nestec S.A. Centre de Recherche Nestlé Vers-chez-les-Blanc Case Postale 44 1000 Lausanne 26 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | Borne, Patrice Daniel Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | Application number, filing date | 01112551.5 | 23.05.2001 | [2002/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1262425 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B65D85/60 | [2002/49] | CPC: |
B65D75/20 (EP,US);
A23G3/50 (EP,US);
B65D33/2533 (EP,US);
B65D75/12 (EP,US);
B65D85/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/49] | Extension states | AL | 04.06.2003 | LT | 04.06.2003 | LV | 04.06.2003 | MK | 04.06.2003 | RO | 04.06.2003 | SI | 04.06.2003 | Title | German: | Verpackung einer Anzahl von Süsswarenstücken in Reihen/Spalten-Anordnung und Verfahren dazu | [2002/49] | English: | Packaged confectionery combination including confectionery pieces packed tightly in rows and columns and packaging method | [2002/49] | French: | Emballage contenant des articles de confiserie disposés en rangées serrées et procédé d'emballage | [2002/49] | Examination procedure | 04.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/32] | 24.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR850597 (PAD Y WAX COMPANY) [X] 1-5,7-11,15,16,18,22,23 * page 1, line 1 - page 6, line 22; figures 6,7 * [Y] 6,14,17; | [XY]EP0109353 (SIG SCHWEIZ INDUSTRIEGES [CH]) [X] 1-5,7,8,11-13,15,16,18,22,23 * the whole document * * page 4, paragraph 4 - page 7, paragraph 2; figure 3 * [Y] 20,6,14,17; | [XY]US4658963 (JUD WILFRIED [AT]) [X] 19,21 * column 2, line 44 - column 5, line 21; figures 2-4 * [Y] 14,20; | [A]EP0508899 (ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS [US]) [A] 11* column 2, line 25 - column 4, line 16; figures 1-3 *; | [Y]US5215249 (GORRIERI GIORDANO [IT]) [Y] 6 * column 2, line 37 - line 63; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP1041012 (SOREMARTEC SA [BE], et al) [Y] 17 * column 1, line 5 - line 13; figure 3 * |