EP1162488 - Optical fiber aerial cable and manufacturing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2004 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.06.2004 [2004/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CCS Technology Inc. Suite 278-T, 103 Foulk Road Wilmington, DE 19803 / GB | [2001/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schneider, Reiner Flurstrasse 32 96237 Ebersdorf / DE | 02 /
Stöcklein, Waldemar, Dr. Nelkenweg 24 96450 Coburg / DE | [2001/50] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schlossschmidstrasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/50] | Epping Hermann & Fischer Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01112747.9 | 25.05.2001 | [2001/50] | Priority number, date | DE2000128562 | 09.06.2000 Original published format: DE 10028562 | [2001/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1162488 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1162488 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/44 | [2001/50] | CPC: |
G02B6/4419 (EP,US);
G02B6/4422 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Optisches Luftkabel und zugehöriges Herstellungsverfahren | [2001/50] | English: | Optical fiber aerial cable and manufacturing method | [2001/50] | French: | Câble aérien à fibre optique et méthode de fabrication | [2001/50] | Examination procedure | 02.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/25] | 19.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/25] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4645298 (GARTSIDE III CHARLES H [US]) [X] 1,7,9,11-14 * column 2, line 21 - column 7, line 10; figures 3-5 *; | [A]US4776665 (OESTREICH ULRICH [DE]) [A] 1-14* column 2, line 36 - column 5, line 3 *; | [X]GB2240189 (TELEPHONE CABLES LTD [GB]) [X] 1,3,4,9,11-13 * page 1 - page 4; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]EP0660149 (BICC PLC [GB]) [A] 1-14 * abstract *; | [A]DE19605276 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 34 - column 4, line 18 * |