EP1162566 - Methods and apparatuses for recognising or checking patterns [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2009 | Change - representative | published on 20.01.2010 [2010/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/50] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza-Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagao, Kenji 359-21, Oba-cho, Aoba-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 225-0023 / JP | [2001/50] | Representative(s) | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf International S.A. Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Balsters, Robert, et al Novagraaf International S.A. Avenue du Pailly 25 1220 Les Avanchets-Genève / CH | ||
Former [2001/50] | Balsters, Robert, et al Novapat International SA, 9, rue du Valais 1202 Genève / CH | Application number, filing date | 01112830.3 | 30.05.2001 | [2001/50] | Priority number, date | JP20000168560 | 06.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000168560 | [2001/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1162566 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/50] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1162566 | Date: | 28.07.2004 | [2004/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/62, G06K9/68, G06K9/00 | [2004/31] | CPC: |
G06V40/168 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/50] | G06K9/62 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/16] |
Former [2001/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Geräte zur Erkennung oder Prüfen von Mustern | [2004/52] | English: | Methods and apparatuses for recognising or checking patterns | [2001/50] | French: | Procédés et appareils de reconnaissance ou d'inspection des modèles | [2001/50] |
Former [2001/50] | Verfaren und Geräte zur Erkennung oder Prüfen von Mustern | Examination procedure | 11.08.2004 | Examination requested [2004/42] | 31.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.08.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/09] | 19.09.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2006/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0944018 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1,2,6,7,11,12,15,16,19,20 * the whole document *; | [A] - BELHUMEUR P N ET AL, "EIGENFACES VS. FISHERFACES: RECOGNITION USING CLASS SPECIFIC LINEAR PROJECTION", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (19970701), vol. 19, no. 7, ISSN 0162-8828, pages 711 - 720, XP000698170 [A] 1,2,6,7,11,12,15,16,19,20 * paragraph [02.4] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/34.598228 | [A] - THEODORIS, SERGIOS; KOUTROUMBAS, KONSTANTINOS, Pattern Recognition, ISBN 0-12-686140-4, ACADEMIC PRESS, SAN DIEGO, USA, (1999), XP002280745 [A] 1,2,6,7,11,12,15,16,19,20 * page 155, paragraph 5.3.3 - page 167, paragraph 5.7 * | [A] - WATANABE H ET AL, "DISCRIMINATIVE METRIC DESIGN FOR ROBUST PATTERN RECOGNITION", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON SIGNAL PROCESSING, IEEE, INC. NEW YORK, US, (19971101), vol. 45, no. 11, ISSN 1053-587X, pages 2655 - 2662, XP000754250 [A] 1,2,6,7,11,12,15,16,19,20 * page 2655, column 2, paragraph LAST - page 2656, paragraph FIRST * * page 2657, column 1, line 34, paragraph 2 * [A] [A] DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/78.650091 |