18.04.2008 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] |
05.10.2007 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] |
03.08.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.09.2007 [2007/36] |
03.11.2006 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 06.12.2006 [2006/49] |
04.08.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.09.2006 [2006/36] |
11.11.2005 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 28.12.2005 [2005/52] |
05.11.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
05.11.2005 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
04.11.2005 |
Change - inventor |
published on 21.12.2005 [2005/51] |
15.06.2005 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
26.04.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
04.03.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.03.2005 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.02.2005 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.10.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
06.10.2004 |
Deletion: Reply to examination report |
|
27.07.2004 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
07.06.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
25.02.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.01.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.10.2003 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.06.2003 |
First examination report |
|
05.06.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
10.03.2003 |
Renewal fee |
|
17.05.2002 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 03.07.2002 [2002/27] |
13.04.2002 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
20.03.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
19.10.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.12.2001 [2001/49] |
18.10.2001 |
Request for accelerated examination |
|
24.08.2001 |
Publication of search report |
published on 10.10.2001 [2001/41] |
28.07.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.09.2001 [2001/37] |
08.06.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|