Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | USRE39352E | Global Dossier | 17.10.2006 | E | Priority number | Date | US94094101 | 28.08.2001 | JP2543596 | 13.02.1996 | US8799897 | 13.02.1997 | US80722804 | 23.03.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1132467 | Global Dossier | 28.12.2005 | B1 | EP1132467 | 10.10.2001 | A3 | EP1132467 | 12.09.2001 | A2 | Priority number | Date | JP2543596 | 13.02.1996 | EP97102270 | 13.02.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | USRE38687E | 11.01.2005 | E | Priority number | Date | US79989797 | 13.02.1997 | US94094101 | 28.08.2001 | JP2543596 | 13.02.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3075390B | Global Dossier | 14.08.2000 | B2 | JPH09215494 | 19.08.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2543596 | 13.02.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0790303 | Global Dossier | 20.08.1997 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2543596 | 13.02.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69735015T | 08.03.2007 | T2 | DE69735015D1 | 02.02.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP2543596 | 13.02.1996 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6080553 | 27.06.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2543596 | 13.02.1996 | Type | Earlier application | EP0790303 |