EP1132467 - Novel creatine amidinohydrolase, production thereof and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2008 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: DE | published on 21.05.2008 [2008/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyo Boseki Kabushiki Kaisha 2-8, Dojimahama 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8230 / JP | [2005/52] |
Former [2001/37] | For all designated states Toyo Boseki Kabushiki Kaisha 2-8, Dojimahama 2-chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8230 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sogabe, Atsushi, c/oToyo Boseki Kabushiki Kaisha Tsuruga Insti. of Biotechnology, 10-24, Toyo-cho Tsuruga-shi, Fukui 914-0047 / JP | 02 /
Hattori, Takashi, c/oToyo Boseki Kabushiki Kaisha Tsuruga Insti. of Biotechnology, 10-24, Toyo-cho Tsuruga-shi, Fukui 914-0047 / JP | 03 /
Nishiya, Yoshiaki, c/oToyo Boseki Kabushiki Kaisha Tsuruga Insti. of Biotechnology, 10-24, Toyo-cho Tsuruga-shi, Fukui 914-0047 / JP | 04 /
Kawamura, Yoshihisa, c/oToyo Boseki Kabushiki K. Tsuruga Insti. of Biotechnology, 10-24, Toyo-cho Tsuruga-shi, Fukui 914-0047 / JP | [2005/51] |
Former [2001/37] | 01 /
Sogabe, Atsushi, c/oToyo Boseki Kabushiki Kaisha Tsuruga Insti. of Biotechnology, 10-24, Toyo-cho Tsuruga-shi, Fukui 914 / JP | ||
02 /
Hattori, Takashi, c/oToyo Boseki Kabushiki Kaisha Tsuruga Insti. of Biotechnology, 10-24, Toyo-cho Tsuruga-shi, Fukui 914 / JP | |||
03 /
Nishiya, Yoshiaki, c/oToyo Boseki Kabushiki Kaisha Tsuruga Insti. of Biotechnology, 10-24, Toyo-cho Tsuruga-shi, Fukui 914 / JP | |||
04 /
Kawamura, Yoshihisa, c/oToyo Boseki Kabushiki K. Tsuruga Insti. of Biotechnology, 10-24, Toyo-cho Tsuruga-shi, Fukui 914 / JP | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/37] | Helbing, Jörg, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner, Postfach 10 22 41 50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 01113052.3 | 13.02.1997 | [2001/37] | Priority number, date | JP19960025435 | 13.02.1996 Original published format: JP 2543596 | [2001/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1132467 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1132467 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | [2001/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1132467 | Date: | 28.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C12N9/78, C12N9/80, C12Q1/34 | [2001/37] | CPC: |
G01N33/52 (EP,US);
C12Q1/34 (EP,US);
G01N2333/978 (EP,US);
Y10S435/829 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/37] | Title | German: | Neue Creatin-amidinohydrolase, ihre Herstellung und Verwendung | [2001/37] | English: | Novel creatine amidinohydrolase, production thereof and use thereof | [2001/37] | French: | Nouvelle créatinamidino-hydrolase, procédé de production et utilisation de celle-ci | [2001/37] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 10.10.2001 | Examination requested [2001/49] | 10.10.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 05.04.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2003 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 15.10.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.07.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97102270.2 / EP0790303 | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.02.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2008/21] |
Former [2007/45] | DE | 29.03.2006 | |
Former [2007/36] | IT | 28.12.2005 | |
DE | 29.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | DE | 29.03.2006 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS6291182 ; | [A]JPH07265074 ; | [A]US3907644 (MOLLERING HANS, et al) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US5451520 (FURUKAWA KEISUKE [JP], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870929), vol. 011, no. 300, Database accession no. (C - 449), & JP62091182 A 19870425 (KOBAYASHI SEIYAKU KK) [X] 1-12,15-19 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960229), vol. 096, no. 002, & JP07265074 A 19951017 (TOYOBO CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |