EP1162736 - Single-ended push-pull amplifier circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.05.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.06.2004 [2004/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEAC CORPORATION 3-7-3, Naka-cho Musashino-shi Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/50] | For all designated states TEAC CORPORATION 3-7-3, Naka-cho Musashino-shi Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Komuro, Yoshiyuki 474-302 Oomaki Saitama-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | [2001/50] | Representative(s) | Strych, Werner Maximilian Josef, et al Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/50] | Strych, Werner Maximilian Josef, Dr., et al Hansmann & Vogeser, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01113071.3 | 29.05.2001 | [2001/50] | Priority number, date | JP20000168202 | 05.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000168202 | [2001/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1162736 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/50] | Classification | IPC: | H03F3/30 | [2001/50] | CPC: |
H03F3/3069 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/50] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Gegentaktverstärkerschaltung mit Eintaktausgang | [2001/50] | English: | Single-ended push-pull amplifier circuit | [2001/50] | French: | Circuit amplificateur du type push-pull à sortie unique | [2001/50] | Examination procedure | 02.12.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/26] | 23.01.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |