EP1160162 - Band tightening and cutting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 05.04.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2002 | Withdrawal of application | published on 22.05.2002 [2002/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-city Mie 510-8503 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | For all designated states Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-City, Mie, 510-8503 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Watanabe, Kunihiko Sumitomo Wiring Syst., Ltd., 1-14 Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-city, Mie, 510-8503 / JP | [2001/49] | Representative(s) | Herzog, Markus, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | Herzog, Markus, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01113074.7 | 29.05.2001 | [2001/49] | Priority number, date | JP20000165424 | 02.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000165424 | [2001/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1160162 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/49] | Classification | IPC: | B65B13/02 | [2001/49] | CPC: |
B65B13/027 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53252 (EP,US);
Y10T29/53257 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/49] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM SPANNEN UND SCHNEIDEN EINES BANDES | [2001/49] | English: | Band tightening and cutting device | [2001/49] | French: | Dispositif de serrage et de découpage d'une bande | [2001/49] | Examination procedure | 29.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/49] | 21.03.2002 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/21] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |