EP1160106 - Suspension arm for a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.03.2005 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.03.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.05.2005 [2005/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BENTELER AG Residenzstrasse 1 D-33104 Paderborn / DE | [2001/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Christophliemke, Wigbert Am Landerbach 113 33758 Schloss Holt-Stukenbrock / DE | 02 /
Wang, Shaolin, Dr.-Ing. Im Wilhelmsland 1 34355 Spiekershausen / DE | [2001/49] | Representative(s) | Bockermann, Rolf Bergstrasse 159 44791 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | Bockermann, Rolf, Dipl.-Ing. Bergstrasse 159 44791 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 01113126.5 | 29.05.2001 | [2001/49] | Priority number, date | DE2000209695U | 31.05.2000 Original published format: DE 20009695 U | [2001/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1160106 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1160106 | Date: | 08.10.2003 | [2003/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B60G7/00 | [2001/49] | CPC: |
B62D19/00 (EP,US);
B60G7/001 (EP,US);
B60G2206/012 (EP,US);
B60G2206/122 (EP,US);
B60G2206/72 (EP,US);
B60G2206/8201 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2001/49] | Title | German: | Lenker für ein Kraftfahrzeug | [2001/49] | English: | Suspension arm for a vehicle | [2001/49] | French: | Bras de suspension pour véhicule | [2001/49] | Examination procedure | 06.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/24] | 18.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/19] | 06.12.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH07119729 (IZUMI KOGYO CO LTD) [X] 1,3 * figures 11,12 * [Y] 2; | [X]JPH11115429 (SUZUKI MOTOR CO) [X] 1 * figures 1-4 *; | [X]US3142493 (HARTZELL HERSCHELL H, et al) [X] 1 * column 2, line 24 - line 36; figures 2-4 *; | [X]FR82194E (RENAULT) [X] 1 * figures 1,2 * * page 1, line 4 - line 8 * * page 1, line 28 - line 30 *; | [Y]US5362090 (TAKEUCHI NAOYUKI [JP]) [Y] 2 * page 4; figures 3-9 * * column 3, line 41 - line 45 *; | [A]US5639110 (PIERCE WILLIAM C [US], et al) [A] 1 * abstract * |