EP1160555 - Force sensor having two bending beams [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.06.2005 [2005/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hottinger Baldwin Messtechnik GmbH Im Tiefen See 45 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2002/12] |
Former [2001/49] | For all designated states HBM Mess- und Systemtechnik GmbH Im Tiefen See 45 64293 Darmstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Andrae, Jürgen Fichtenweg 11 64331 Weiterstadt / DE | [2001/49] | Representative(s) | Behrens, Helmut KNPP - Knigge Nourney Völger Böhm Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartGmbB Gross-Gerauer Weg 55 64295 Darmstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | Behrens, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing. Gross-Gerauer Weg 55 64295 Darmstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 01113148.9 | 30.05.2001 | [2001/49] | Priority number, date | DE20001027116 | 31.05.2000 Original published format: DE 10027116 | [2001/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1160555 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1160555 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | [2004/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G01L1/22 | [2001/49] | CPC: |
G01L1/2243 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2005/05] |
Former [2001/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Doppelbiegebalken-Kraftaufnehmer | [2001/49] | English: | Force sensor having two bending beams | [2001/49] | French: | Capteur de force avec deux poutres de flexion | [2001/49] | Examination procedure | 01.12.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/23] | 11.01.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 23.12.2004 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2004 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2004 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2004 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2004 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2004 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2004 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2004 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2004 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2004 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2004 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2004 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2004 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2004 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2004 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2004 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2004 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2004 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 23.12.2004 | TR   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 23.12.2004 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2004 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH08110260 ; | [Y]EP0227850 (HOTTINGER MESSTECHNIK BALDWIN [DE]) [Y] 1-11 * abstract *; | [A]US5183125 (SCHURR MICHAEL [DE]) [A] 1-11* the whole document * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960830), vol. 1996, no. 08, & JP08110260 A 19960430 (YAMATO SCALE CO LTD) [Y] 1-11 * abstract * |