EP1160796 - Shift register and electronic apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2007 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.06.2007 [2007/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CASIO COMPUTER CO., LTD. 6-2, Hon-machi 1-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/27] |
Former [2001/49] | For all designated states Casio Computer Co., Ltd. 6-2, Hon-machi 1-chome Shibuya-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kanbara, Minoru, Patent Dpt., Dvpt Div., Hamura R&D Center, Casio Computer Co,Ltd, 3-2-1,Sakae-cho Hamura-shi, Tokyo 205-8555 / JP | 02 /
Sasaki, Kazuhiro, Patent Dpt., Dvpt. Div., Hamura R&D Center, Casio Computer Co,Ltd, 3-2-1,Sakae-cho Hamura-shi, Tokyo 205-8555 / JP | 03 /
Morosawa, Katsuhiko, Patent Dpt., Dvpt Div., Hamura R&D Center, Casio Computer Co,Ltd, 3-2-1,Sakae-cho Hamura-shi, Tokyo 205-8555 / JP | [2001/49] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/49] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01113220.6 | 30.05.2001 | [2001/49] | Priority number, date | JP20000162671 | 31.05.2000 Original published format: JP 2000162671 | JP20000169002 | 06.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000169002 | JP20010128909 | 26.04.2001 Original published format: JP 2001128909 | [2001/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1160796 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1160796 | Date: | 19.05.2004 | [2004/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1160796 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G11C19/28, G09G3/36 | [2001/49] | CPC: |
G09G3/3677 (EP,US);
G09G3/36 (KR);
G11C19/00 (EP,US);
G11C19/28 (EP,US);
G09G2300/0408 (EP,US);
G09G2310/0281 (EP,US);
Y10S323/907 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2005/06] |
Former [2001/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Schieberegister und elektronisches Gerät | [2001/49] | English: | Shift register and electronic apparatus | [2001/49] | French: | Registre à décalage et appareil électronique | [2001/49] | Examination procedure | 30.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/49] | 27.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06009250.9 / EP1684310 | Opposition(s) | 10.04.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0957491 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-29 * abstract *; | [A]KR100242244B (LG PHILIPS LCD CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-12,20-29* figure 2 *; | [A]DE19950860 (LG PHILIPS LCD CO [KR]) [A] 1-29 * figure 2 *; | [X]US6300928 (KIM YOUNG DAE [KR]) [X] 13-19 |