EP1263195 - Keypad system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2005 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.02.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.04.2005 [2005/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/49] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kaelbling, Michael, Dr. Gustav-Heinemann-Ring 71 81739 München / DE | [2002/49] | Application number, filing date | 01113408.7 | 01.06.2001 | [2002/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1263195 | Date: | 04.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1263195 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/23, H01H13/70 | [2002/49] | CPC: |
H01H13/84 (EP,US);
H04M1/72475 (EP,US);
H04M1/22 (EP,US);
H04M1/23 (EP,US);
H01H2217/012 (EP,US);
H01H2217/032 (EP,US);
H01H2217/033 (EP,US);
H01H2231/022 (EP,US);
H01H2239/05 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/35] |
Former [2002/49] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Tastatursystem | [2002/49] | English: | Keypad system | [2002/49] | French: | Système de clavier numérique | [2002/49] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/32] | 05.06.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.10.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.10.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 16.02.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.08.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0685953 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1, lines 1-57; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO9704472 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * page 3, line 31 - page 7, line 20; figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO9840997 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract ** page 3, line 17 - page 4, line 31; figures 1-3 * |