EP1166611 - Driving device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.07.2005 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.08.2005 [2005/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fella-Werke GmbH & Co. KG Fellastrasse 2 90537 Feucht bei Nürnberg / DE | [2002/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pürrer, Josef Andreas-Schramm-Strasse 33 90537 Feucht / DE | 02 /
Kohl Bernhard Wilhelm-Löhe-Weg 2 90537 Feucht / DE | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01113412.9 | 01.06.2001 | [2002/01] | Priority number, date | DE2000210904U | 20.06.2000 Original published format: DE 20010904 U | [2002/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1166611 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1166611 | Date: | 01.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A01B71/06, A01D69/06 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
F16H1/14 (EP);
A01B71/066 (EP);
F16H37/065 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, NL [2002/38] |
Former [2002/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Antriebsvorrichtung | [2002/01] | English: | Driving device | [2002/01] | French: | Dispositif d'entrainement | [2002/01] | Examination procedure | 26.06.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/35] | 03.07.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.10.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GB, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, PT, SE, TR | 03.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 08.08.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 08.08.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | all designated states | Date: | 12.04.2002 | [2002/36] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2357161 (ZAGA MAQUINARIA AGRICOLA [ES]) [X] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US4860526 (HOTTES RONALD W [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [XA]EP0548720 (KRONE BERNHARD GMBH MASCHF [DE]) [X] 1,2 * page 5, line 4 - line 41; figures 1-5 * [A] 3; | [A]US5339907 (ROTH ANDREAS [DE]) [A] 3 * figure - *; | [A]EP0678237 (FREUDENDAHL J FAB AS [DK]) [A] 1* figure - * | by applicant | DE29919025U |