EP1167001 - Process for making webs, strips and chips having multiple filamentary carbon fibres [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 05.09.2007 [2007/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAERTEX GmbH & Co. KG Brochterbecker Damm 52 48369 Saerbeck / DE | [2006/12] |
Former [2006/10] | For all designated states SAERTEX GmbH & Co. KG Industriestrasse 9 48369 Saerbeck / DE | ||
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states SAERTEX Wagener GmbH & Co. KG Brochterbecker Damm 52 48369 Saerbeck / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wagener, Gert Neubrückenstrasse 43 48282 Emsdetten / DE | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Habbel, Hans-Georg, et al Habbel & Habbel Patentanwälte Am Kanonengraben 11 48151 Münster / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | Habbel, Hans-Georg, Dipl.-Ing., et al Habbel & Habbel, Patentanwälte, Am Kanonengraben 11 48151 Münster / DE | Application number, filing date | 01113448.3 | 02.06.2001 | [2002/01] | Priority number, date | DE2000129956 | 26.06.2000 Original published format: DE 10029956 | DE2000135888 | 24.07.2000 Original published format: DE 10035888 | [2002/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1167001 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1167001 | Date: | 11.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B29C70/16, D04H3/04, D04H3/12 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
D04H3/002 (EP);
B29C70/16 (EP);
D04H3/015 (EP);
D04H3/04 (EP);
D04H3/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2002/38] |
Former [2002/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Filamentfasergruppen oder -bündel aus Carbonfasern, Naturfasern od. dgl. | [2002/01] | English: | Process for making webs, strips and chips having multiple filamentary carbon fibres | [2002/01] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de nappes, de rubans, de plaquettes comportant des fibres de carbone multiples et filamentaires | [2002/01] | Examination procedure | 27.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/35] | 03.07.2002 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.10.2002 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, CY, DK, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 13.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.12.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.03.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 10.03.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.08.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 09.08.2002 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 11.05.2005 | BE | 30.06.2005 | ES | 22.08.2005 | [2007/36] |
Former [2006/25] | BE | 30.06.2005 | |
ES | 22.08.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | ES | 22.08.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4339490 (YOSHIOKA NAONORI, et al) [X] 1-8 * column 3, line 14 - line 47 *; | [X]US4507164 (POTT RICHARD [DE]) [X] 1,2 * figures 1-4 * * claim 1 *; | [X]FR2594858 (CHOMARAT & CIE [FR]) [X] 1,2 * figures 1,2 *; | [X]EP0376472 (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 1-8 * page 3, line 3 - line 21 *; | [X]US5164255 (WEEKS GREGORY P [US]) [X] 1-8 * column 2, line 40 - line 57; figure 1 *; | [X]EP0628401 (YAMAHA CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2 * column 4, line 29 - column 5, line 1 *; | [A]WO9704946 (SAERTEX WAGENER GMBH & CO KG F [DE], et al) [A] 1-8* the whole document *; | [X]FR2740149 (YKK CORP [JP]) [X] 1-8 * page 5, line 16 - line 25; figures 1A,1B *; | [X]EP0916477 (DUQUEINE GILLES [FR]) [X] 1-8 * paragraph [0011]; figure 1 *; | [E]EP1134314 (HEXCEL COMPOSITES [FR]) [E] 1-8 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0054]; figure 8 * |