EP1154045 - Process for the manufacture of a mould, of which the form giving surfaces are coated with a antisticking coating made of a chromium based galvanic layer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.04.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2003 | Withdrawal of application | published on 21.05.2003 [2003/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | [2001/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hennel, Paul Oberlindhofstrasse 40 93173 Wenzenbach / DE | 02 /
Ungeheuer, Heinz-Guenter Schubertstrasse 24 76344 Eggenstein-Leop. / DE | [2001/46] | Application number, filing date | 01113491.3 | 19.03.1998 | [2001/46] | Priority number, date | DE1997113566 | 02.04.1997 Original published format: DE 19713566 | [2001/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1154045 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C25D7/00, B29C33/56 | [2001/46] | CPC: |
B29C33/56 (EP,KR);
C25D7/00 (EP,KR,US);
C25D5/003 (KR);
C25D5/56 (KR);
C25D5/617 (KR);
C25D5/627 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [2001/46] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Formwerkzeuges, dessen formgebende Oberflächen mit einer Antihaftbeschichtung in Form einer Galvanoschicht auf Chrombasis versehen sind | [2001/46] | English: | Process for the manufacture of a mould, of which the form giving surfaces are coated with a antisticking coating made of a chromium based galvanic layer | [2001/46] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un moule dont les surfaces de formage sont couvertes d'un revêtement anti-adhérent sous forme d'une couche galvanique à base de chromium | [2001/46] | Examination procedure | 02.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/46] | 21.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2003 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2003/21] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP98912489.6 / EP0973960 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS6244410 ; | [A]EP0374080 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]); | [A]WO9413864 (CENTRE TECHN IND MECANIQUE [FR], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870730), vol. 011, no. 234, Database accession no. (M - 611), & JP62044410 A 19870226 (HITACHI TOKYO ELECTRON CO LTD;OTHERS: 01) [A] * abstract * |