EP1168666 - Method and system for controlling uplink power in a satellite communication system using power leveling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.05.2004 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.06.2004 [2004/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORTHROP GRUMMAN CORPORATION 1840 Century Park East Los Angeles CA 90067-2199 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2003/49] | For all designated states Northrop Grumman Corporation 1840 Century Park East Los Angeles, CA 90067-2199 / US | ||
Former [2003/47] | For all designated states Northrop Grumman Corporation 1840 Century Park East Los Angeles, CA 90067-2177 / US | ||
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states TRW Inc. One Space Park Redondo Beach, California 90278 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wright, David A. 1118 Tenth Street Hermosa Beach, CA 90254 / US | 02 /
Jue, Reginald 2317 Elm Avenue Manhattan Beach, CA 90266 / US | 03 /
Nivens, Dennis A. 312 Monterey Boulevard Hermosa Beach, CA 90254 / US | 04 /
Carrozza, Dominic P. 2221B Dufour Avenue Redondo Beach, CA 90278 / US | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Steffen J. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | Schmidt, Steffen J., Dipl.-Ing. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01113504.3 | 11.06.2001 | [2002/01] | Priority number, date | US20000596671 | 19.06.2000 Original published format: US 596671 | [2002/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1168666 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1168666 | Date: | 03.12.2003 | [2003/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/185 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
H04B7/18513 (EP);
H04B7/18543 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/01] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Steuerung der Stärke des Aufwärtssignals in einem Satelliten Kommunikationssystem mit Stärkeschwellen | [2002/01] | English: | Method and system for controlling uplink power in a satellite communication system using power leveling | [2002/01] | French: | Méthode et système de commande de la puissance montante dans un système de communication par satellite utilisant des niveaux de puissance | [2002/01] | Examination procedure | 03.05.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0969606 (HUGHES ELECTRONICS CORP [US]) [X] 1-28 * column 5, line 51 - line 53; claim 1 *; | [X]US5768684 (GRUBB JERROLD LEE [US], et al) [X] 1-28 * claims 1-8 * |