EP1162171 - Fuel reforming apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.09.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.10.2006 [2006/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/46] | For all designated states Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | ||
Former [2001/50] | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho, Toyota-shi Aichi-ken 471-8571 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimazu, Takashi Toyota Jidosha K. K., 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP | [2001/50] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/34] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/50] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01113836.9 | 06.06.2001 | [2001/50] | Priority number, date | JP20000172373 | 08.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000172373 | [2001/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1162171 | Date: | 12.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1162171 | Date: | 16.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C01B3/48 | [2001/50] | CPC: |
H01M8/0631 (EP);
B01B1/005 (EP);
B01F23/12 (EP);
B01F23/2132 (EP);
B01F25/3132 (EP);
B01F25/31322 (EP);
B01J19/2485 (EP);
B01J19/249 (EP);
B01J19/26 (EP);
B01J4/002 (EP);
B01J8/0278 (EP);
B01J8/0492 (EP);
B01J8/0496 (EP);
C01B3/16 (EP);
C01B3/48 (EP);
F28C3/08 (EP);
F28D21/0015 (EP);
F28D7/1615 (EP);
F28D9/0062 (EP);
F28D9/0093 (EP);
F28F13/003 (EP);
F28F13/187 (EP);
H01M8/0612 (EP);
H01M8/0618 (EP);
B01F2025/918 (EP);
B01J2208/00168 (EP);
B01J2208/00194 (EP);
B01J2208/00212 (EP);
B01J2208/00362 (EP);
B01J2208/0053 (EP);
B01J2208/00849 (EP);
B01J2219/00087 (EP);
B01J2219/00092 (EP);
B01J2219/00096 (EP);
B01J2219/00117 (EP);
B01J2219/00128 (EP);
B01J2219/00159 (EP);
B01J2219/00763 (EP);
B01J2219/2453 (EP);
B01J2219/2458 (EP);
B01J2219/2459 (EP);
B01J2219/2462 (EP);
B01J2219/2485 (EP);
C01B2203/0205 (EP);
C01B2203/0227 (EP);
C01B2203/0283 (EP);
C01B2203/0288 (EP);
C01B2203/044 (EP);
C01B2203/047 (EP);
C01B2203/066 (EP);
C01B2203/0844 (EP);
C01B2203/085 (EP);
C01B2203/0883 (EP);
C01B2203/0894 (EP);
C01B2203/12 (EP);
C01B2203/1205 (EP);
C01B2203/1223 (EP);
C01B2203/1241 (EP);
C01B2203/1247 (EP);
C01B2203/1276 (EP);
C01B2203/1294 (EP);
C01B2203/1604 (EP);
C01B2203/1638 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/36] |
Former [2001/50] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Brennstoffreformer | [2001/50] | English: | Fuel reforming apparatus | [2001/50] | French: | Dispositif de reformage de carburant | [2001/50] | Examination procedure | 07.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/50] | 30.06.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 06.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP05024832.7 / EP1645316 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0985635 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 4 - line 27 *; | [AP]DE19902926 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [AP] 1 * column 3, line 55 - column 4, line 10 * |