Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
22.10.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.12.2004 [2004/50] |
30.07.2004 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
02.07.2004 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
20.01.2004 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
12.12.2003 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
30.09.2003 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
24.09.2003 | Deletion: Fee payment for extension state | |
24.09.2003 | Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state | |
30.05.2003 | Definitive list of designations | published on 16.07.2003 [2003/29] |
30.05.2003 | First examination report | |
23.05.2003 | Examination report or reply | |
30.04.2003 | Renewal fee | |
29.11.2002 | Request for examination filed | published on 15.01.2003 [2003/03] |
06.09.2002 | Publication of search report | published on 23.10.2002 [2002/43] |
02.11.2001 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 19.12.2001 [2001/51] |