blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1164247

EP1164247 - Window or door with a cladding profile fixed to the outside surface [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.10.2004
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip22.10.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.12.2004  [2004/50]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SFS Handels Holding AG
Nefenstrasse 30
CH-9435 Heerbrugg / CH
[2001/51]
Inventor(s)01 / Leitner, Michael
Buchenweg 14
6923 Lauterach / AT
 [2001/51]
Representative(s)Ludescher, Hans
SFS Gruppe
Patentabteilung
Rosenbergsaustrasse 10
9435 Heerbrugg / CH
[N/P]
Former [2001/51]Ludescher, Hans
SFS Stadler Gruppe Patentabteilung Nefenstrasse 30
9435 Heerbrugg / CH
Application number, filing date01114195.912.06.2001
[2001/51]
Priority number, dateDE200012939015.06.2000         Original published format: DE 10029390
[2001/51]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1164247
Date:19.12.2001
Language:DE
[2001/51]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP1164247
Date:23.10.2002
[2002/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP09.09.2002
ClassificationIPC:E06B3/30, E06B3/62
[2001/51]
CPC:
E06B3/302 (EP); E06B3/62 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE,   TR [2001/51]
TitleGerman:Fenster oder Tür mit einem auf der Aussenfläche aufgesetzten Verkleidungsprofil[2001/51]
English:Window or door with a cladding profile fixed to the outside surface[2001/51]
French:Fenêtre ou porte avec un profilé de recouvrement fixé sur la face extérieure[2001/51]
Examination procedure15.11.2002Examination requested  [2003/03]
28.05.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.01.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.06.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/50]
09.07.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2004/50]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.04.2003Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.06.200404   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[DX]DE9400552U  (LANGNER & LEHMANN KG LANCO ZAR [DE]) [DX] 1-3,9,10 * page 3, line 8 - line 10 * * figure 5 *;
 [A]DE1697656U  (GROSSMANN ERICH [AT]) [A] 1-3,9 * page 7, line 21 - line 23 * * figure 1 *
by applicantEP0666400
 DE3844195
 EP0961002
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.