EP1178229 - Method of arranging a bearing bushing in a forged connecting-rod of steel for a combustion engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.01.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.03.2006 [2006/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [2002/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Luchner, Clemens Hasenweg 9 85598 Baldham / DE | 02 /
Pöllath, Helmut Am Bogen 15 82223 Eichenau / DE | 03 /
Mittrach, Jürgen Friedensstrasse 42 a 85622 Feldkirchen / DE | [2002/06] | Application number, filing date | 01114279.1 | 13.06.2001 | [2002/06] | Priority number, date | DE2000137999 | 04.08.2000 Original published format: DE 10037999 | [2002/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1178229 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1178229 | Date: | 31.03.2004 | [2004/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1178229 | Date: | 16.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.2004 | Classification | IPC: | F16C33/08, F16C9/04 | [2002/06] | CPC: |
F16C9/04 (EP);
F16C33/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/52] |
Former [2002/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Anordnung einer Lagerbuchse in einem geschmiedeten Stahl-Pleuel für Brennkraftmaschinen | [2002/06] | English: | Method of arranging a bearing bushing in a forged connecting-rod of steel for a combustion engine | [2002/06] | French: | Procédé pour la disposition d'un coussinet dans une bielle d'acier forgée pour moteurs a combustion interne | [2002/06] | Examination procedure | 21.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/25] | 30.08.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.12.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 02.12.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB711123 (JAMES MILTON LEAKE) [A] 1-6 * page 2, line 1 - line 108; figures 1-10 *; | [A]DE4315392 (MAHLE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [AD]DE658929 (ELISABETHHUETTE OSKAR WIEDERHO) [AD] 1-6 * page 2, line 38 - line 111; figures 1-5 * |