EP1164409 - Prism optical system for reflection type projector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.05.2004 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.07.2004 [2004/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuji Photo Optical Co., Ltd. 1-324, Uetakecho Saitama-shi Saitama, 330-8624 / JP | For all designated states VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN, LIMITED 12, 3-chome, Moriya-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken, 221-8528 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | For all designated states Fuji Photo Optical Co., Ltd. 1-324, Uetakecho Saitama-shi, Saitama, 330-8624 / JP | ||
For all designated states VICTOR COMPANY OF JAPAN, LIMITED 12, 3-chome, Moriya-cho, Kanagawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa-ken, 221-8528 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Monma, Kouichirou Fuji Photo Optical Co., Ltd., 1-324, Uetakecho Saitama-shi, Saitama, 330-8624 / JP | 02 /
Ozawa, Naoki Fuji Photo Optical Co., Ltd., 1-324, Uetakecho Saitama-shi, Saitama, 330-8624 / JP | 03 /
Yasuda, Kenji Fuji Photo Optical Co., Ltd., 1-324, Uetakecho Saitama-shi, Saitama, 330-8624 / JP | 04 /
Naito, Shunichi Fuji Photo Optical Co., Ltd., 1-324, Uetakecho Saitama-shi, Saitama, 330-8624 / JP | 05 /
Moriya, Satoru 872-9, Noda Noda-shi, Chiba-ken, 278-0037 / JP | 06 /
Kojima, Yoshio 12-29-406, Yagami, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken, 211-0956 / JP | 07 /
Yamada, Kazuhiro 12-29-505, Yagami, Saiwai-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken, 211-0956 / JP | [2001/51] | Representative(s) | Prechtel, Jörg, et al C/o Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Richard-Strauss-Straße 80 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | Prechtel, Jörg, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01114364.1 | 13.06.2001 | [2001/51] | Priority number, date | JP20000177694 | 14.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000177694 | [2001/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1164409 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G02B27/10, H04N9/31 | [2001/51] | CPC: |
G02B27/145 (EP);
H04N9/3105 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2002/37] |
Former [2001/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Optisches Prismensystem für Projektoren vom Reflexionstyp | [2001/51] | English: | Prism optical system for reflection type projector | [2001/51] | French: | Système optique à prismes pour un projecteur type réflection | [2001/51] | Examination procedure | 26.06.2001 | Examination requested [2001/51] | 27.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/29] | 05.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/29] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0723174 (IBM [US]) [X] 1,3,4,6* column 2 - column 6; figure 2 * |