EP1266642 - Intervertebral retrieval device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.12.2005 [2005/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lin, Chih-I 14292 Spring Vista Lane Chino Hills, CA 91709 / US | [2002/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2002/51] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/51] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01114373.2 | 13.06.2001 | [2002/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1266642 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/44 | [2002/51] | CPC: |
A61F2/4455 (EP);
A61B17/86 (EP);
A61F2/442 (EP);
A61F2/4611 (EP);
A61F2002/30797 (EP);
A61F2002/308 (EP);
A61F2002/30807 (EP);
A61F2002/30841 (EP);
A61F2002/30904 (EP);
A61F2002/449 (EP);
A61F2310/00017 (EP);
A61F2310/00023 (EP);
A61F2310/00029 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/51] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Wiederherstellung des Zwischenwirbelraums | [2002/51] | English: | Intervertebral retrieval device | [2002/51] | French: | Dispositif de reconstruction de l'espace intervertébral | [2002/51] | Examination procedure | 15.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/12] | 28.01.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/50] | 01.07.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2005 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5603713 (AUST GILBERT M [US], et al) [A] 5* figures 2,4 *; | [A]WO9835636 (SDGI HOLDINGS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-3,5-7 * figures 3,4 *; | [A]WO9938463 (SDGI HOLDINGS INC [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * figures 8,10,35,36 *; | [XY]US6056749 (KUSLICH STEPHEN D [US]) [X] 1-4 * figures 1,11,13,14; claims 1,15 * [Y] 5-8; | [YA]US6080158 (LIN CHIH-I [US]) [Y] 5-8 * figures 2,6 * * column 3, lines 36-39 * [A] 1-3 |