EP1180884 - QAM receiver with gain control, dc-offset correction, and passband equalisation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2008 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FI | published on 17.03.2010 [2010/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | For all designated states The Boeing Company 100 North Riverside Plaza Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US | ||
Former [2007/46] | For all designated states The Boeing Company P.O. Box 3707, M.S. 13-08 Seattle Washington 98124-2207 / US | ||
Former [2002/08] | For all designated states THE BOEING COMPANY P.O. Box 3707, M.S. 13-08 Seattle, Washington 98124-2207 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Strodtbeck, Andrew L. 13600 Marina Pointe, Dr., 414 90292 Marina Del Rey, CA 90292 / US | 02 /
Wah, Lauriston C. 404 S. Prospect Avenue Manhattan Beach, CA 90266 / US | 03 /
Bach, Susan E. 500 Avenue G, 6 Redondo Beach, CA 90277 / US | [2007/46] |
Former [2002/08] | 01 /
Strodtbeck, Andrew L. 13600 Marina Pointe, Dr., 414 90292 Marina Del Rey, CA 90292 / US | ||
02 /
Wah, Lauriston C. 404 S. Prospect Avenue Manhattan Beach, Ca 90266 / US | |||
03 /
Bach, Susan E. 500 Avenue G, 6 Redondo Beach, CA 90277 / US | Representative(s) | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/45] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | ||
Former [2002/08] | Lindner, Michael, Dipl.-Ing., et al Witte, Weller & Partner, Patentanwälte, Postfach 105462 70047 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 01114487.0 | 15.06.2001 | [2002/08] | Priority number, date | US20000639446 | 15.08.2000 Original published format: US 639446 | [2002/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1180884 | Date: | 20.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1180884 | Date: | 22.06.2005 | [2005/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1180884 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/38, H04L27/01, H04L25/06 | [2002/08] | CPC: |
H04L27/01 (EP,US);
H04L25/063 (EP,US);
H04L27/3809 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FI, FR, GB, IT [2006/11] |
Former [2002/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | QAM-Empfänger mit Verstärkungsregelung, Korrektur von Gleichstromverschiebungen und Passbandentzerrung | [2007/26] | English: | QAM receiver with gain control, dc-offset correction, and passband equalisation | [2002/08] | French: | Récepteur MAQ à contrôle de gain, correction de décalage en courant continu, et égalisation en bande passante | [2007/26] |
Former [2002/08] | QAM-Empfänger mit Verstärkungsregelung, Korrektur von Gleichstromverschiebungen, und Passbandentzerrung | ||
Former [2002/08] | Récepteur MAG à contrôle de gain, correction de décalage en courrant continu, et égalisation en la band passante | Examination procedure | 23.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/03] | 08.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.09.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 25.09.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.08.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 14.11.2007 | FI | 14.11.2007 | [2010/11] |
Former [2008/40] | BE | 14.11.2007 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0486474 (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-18 * figures 3,8,9 * * column 3, line 1 - column 5, line 12 * * column 7, line 11 - column 9, line 9 * * column 1, line 6 - line 30 * * column 2, line 4 - line 20 *; | [A]FR2688367 (ALCATEL NV [NL]) [A] 1,10* figures 2,3 *; | [A]US5596605 (KIYANAGI HIROYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,10 * figures 1,10 * * column 15, line 30 - column 17, line 42 * |