EP1166805 - Multiple drainage apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.06.2010 [2010/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gunma Koike Co., Ltd. 222-2, Naganuma-cho, Isesaki-shi Gunma-ken / JP | For all designated states Koike Medical Co., Ltd. 24-8, Matsushima 1-chome, Edogawa-ku Tokyo 132 / JP | [2008/51] |
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states Gunma Koike Co., Ltd. 222-2, Naganuma-cho, Isesaki-shi Gunma-ken / JP | ||
For all designated states Koike Medical Co., Ltd. 24-8, Matsushima 1-chome, Edogawa-ku Tokyo 132 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takahashi, Masao Gunma Koike Co., Ltd., 222-1, Naganumacho Isesaki-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | 02 /
Koike, Kazuo Koike Medical Co., Ltd., 24-8, Matsushima 1-chome Edogawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Takano, Eiichi Koike Medical Co., Ltd., 24-8, Matsushima 1-chome Edogawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2002/01] | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Am Riettor 5 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | ||
Former [2002/01] | Patentanwälte Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner Waldstrasse 33 78048 Villingen-Schwenningen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01114580.2 | 18.06.2001 | [2002/01] | Priority number, date | JP20000182728 | 19.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000182728 | [2002/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1166805 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1166805 | Date: | 21.08.2002 | [2002/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1166805 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/00 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
A61M1/604 (EP,US);
A61M1/78 (EP,US);
A61M1/782 (EP,US);
A61M1/882 (EP,US);
A61M2205/84 (EP,US);
A61M2209/084 (EP,US);
Y10T137/86187 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/20] |
Former [2002/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Mehrfachdrainagevorrichtung | [2002/01] | English: | Multiple drainage apparatus | [2002/01] | French: | Appareil de drainage multiple | [2002/01] | Examination procedure | 25.01.2003 | Examination requested [2003/13] | 22.02.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.06.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 19.10.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.04.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.11.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 05.11.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.04.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.04.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 30.06.2009 | [2010/23] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH0956810 ; | [PX]JP2001190610 ; | [PX]JP2001190609 ; | [XA]US3938540 (HOLBROOK LEGRAND K, et al) [X] 3 * column 5, line 9 - line 29; figure 5 * [A] 1,2; | [X]US4388922 (TELANG ANIL) [X] 1-3 * column 3, line 50 - line 55 * * column 6, line 18 - column 7, line 14; figure - *; | [XA]EP0394687 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [X] 3,6,7 * column 5, line 20 - column 6, line 17 * * figures 6,7 * [A] 1,2,4,5; | [A]WO9855164 (FEMRX INC [US]) [A] 1-3 * page 7, line 21 - line 25; figure 1 *; | [X]US6056731 (KOETKE CLAUS-DIETER [DE], et al) [X] 1-3 * column 7, line 22 - line 55; figure 7 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970731), vol. 1997, no. 07, & JP09056810 A 19970304 (KOIKE MEDICAL:KK;GUNMA KOIKE:KK) [A] 6,7 * abstract * | [PX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010511), vol. 2000, no. 24, & JP2001190610 A 20010717 (GUNMA KOIKE:KK;KOIKE MEDICAL:KK) [PX] 1-3,6,7 * abstract * | [PX] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010511), vol. 2000, no. 24, & JP2001190609 A 20010717 (GUNMA KOIKE:KK;KOIKE MEDICAL:KK) [PX] 1-3,6,7 * abstract * |