EP1168017 - Fiber optic connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.06.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.06.2006 | Refusal of application | published on 12.07.2006 [2006/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOLEX INCORPORATED 2222 Wellington Court Lisle, Illinois 60532 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | For all designated states MOLEX INCORPORATED 2222 Wellington Court Lisle Illinois 60532 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grois, Igor 4010 Greenacre Drive Northbrook, Illinois 60063 / US | 02 /
Kim, Byung 3930 North Clark Street, 406 Chicago, Illinois 60613 / US | 03 /
Marrapode, Thomas R. 2512 Wild Timothy Road Naperville, Illinois 60564 / US | 04 /
Matasek, Jeffrey A. 3320 Foxboro Drive, Apartment G Woodridge, Illinois 60517 / US | [2002/02] |
Former [2002/01] | 01 /
Grois, Igor 4010 Greenacre Drive Northbrook, Illinois 60063 / US | ||
02 /
Kim, Byung 3930 North Clark Street, 406 Chicago, Illinois 60613 / US | |||
03 /
Marrapode, Thomas R. 2512 Wild Timothy Road Naperville, Illinois 60564 / US | |||
04 /
Matasek, Jeffrey A. N40 W7153 Wilson Street Cedaburg, Wisconsin 53012 / US | Representative(s) | Kampfenkel, Klaus Blumbach - Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB Alexandrastrasse 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/01] | Kampfenkel, Klaus, Dipl.-Ing. Blumbach, Kramer & Partner GbR, Alexandrastrasse 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 01114648.7 | 19.06.2001 | [2002/01] | Priority number, date | US20000602975 | 23.06.2000 Original published format: US 602975 | [2002/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1168017 | Date: | 02.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1168017 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | [2004/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/38 | [2002/01] | CPC: |
G02B6/3878 (EP,US);
G02B6/36 (KR);
G02B6/4471 (US);
G02B6/3887 (EP,KR,US);
G02B6/44715 (EP,KR);
G02B6/368 (EP,US);
G02B6/3885 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/11] |
Former [2002/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Faseroptischer Verbinder | [2002/01] | English: | Fiber optic connector | [2002/01] | French: | Connecteur à fibres optiques | [2002/01] | Examination procedure | 28.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/40] | 15.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2006 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.02.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2006/28] | 22.02.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 04.03.2006 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2006/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS63287917 ; | [Y]US4167303 (BOWEN TERRY P, et al); | [Y]EP0374136 (AMP INC [US]); | [Y]US5166995 (BRIGGS ROBERT C [US], et al); | [A]US5288113 (SILVIS PAUL H [US], et al); | [XAY]US5471555 (BRAGA DAVID J [US], et al) |