EP1178600 - Engine operated generator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.03.2008 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2007/19] |
Former [2002/06] | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimizu, Motohiro, Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | 02 /
Nakamura, Masashi, Kabushiki Kaisha Honda Gijutsu Kenkyusho, 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama / JP | [2002/06] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/06] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01114706.3 | 21.06.2001 | [2002/06] | Priority number, date | JP20000198051 | 30.06.2000 Original published format: JP 2000198051 | [2002/22] |
Former [2002/06] | JP20000198051 | 30.07.2000 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1178600 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1178600 | Date: | 09.06.2004 | [2004/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1178600 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02P9/04 | [2002/06] | CPC: |
F02D41/0205 (EP,US);
H02P9/04 (EP,KR,US);
F02D2011/102 (EP,US);
F02D2041/2075 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2005/09] |
Former [2002/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Maschinenbetriebener Generator | [2002/06] | English: | Engine operated generator | [2002/06] | French: | Générateur entraîné par un moteur à combustion interne | [2002/06] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2004 | Examination requested [2004/36] | 02.05.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.02.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3045687 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1,2,7 * page 7, line 1 - page 8, line 23; figure 1 *; | [A]US4561404 (KANNO YOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [A] * abstract *; | [DY]EP0951136 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [DY] 1,2,7 * column 2, line 54 - column 5, line 40; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | JPH0518285 | JPH05146200 | JPH11308896 |