EP1170263 - Alkaloid halogen-doped sulfide glasses for optical amplifier and fabricating method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/02] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heo, Jong, c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-city, Kyungki-do / KR | 02 /
Lee, Dong-Chin, c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-city, Kyungki-do / KR | 03 /
Lee, Hye-Sun, c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-city, Kyungki-do / KR | 04 /
Jung, Sun-Tae, c/o Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-city, Kyungki-do / KR | [2002/02] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/02] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01115010.9 | 20.06.2001 | [2002/02] | Priority number, date | KR20000038691 | 06.07.2000 Original published format: KR 2000038691 | [2002/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1170263 | Date: | 09.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C03C3/32, C03C13/04, H01S3/067 | [2002/02] | CPC: |
C03C3/323 (EP,US);
C03C3/253 (KR);
C03C13/044 (EP,US);
H01S3/1691 (EP,US);
H01S3/17 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB [2002/39] |
Former [2002/02] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Sulphidgläser dotiert mit Halogenalkaloid für optischen Verstärker und Verfahren zur Herstellung | [2002/02] | English: | Alkaloid halogen-doped sulfide glasses for optical amplifier and fabricating method thereof | [2002/02] | French: | Verres de sulfure dotés avec alcaloide d'halogène pour amplificateur optique et procédé de sa fabrication | [2002/02] | Examination procedure | 20.06.2001 | Examination requested [2002/02] | 22.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.09.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/30] | 07.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2007 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5379149 (SNITZER ELIAS [US], et al) [Y] 1-12 * column 5, line 13 - column 8, line 44 *; | [A]WO9703028 (BRITISH TECH GROUP [GB], et al) [A] 1-12 * claims 1-5 *; | [A]GB2342771 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-12* page 5, line 20 - page 6, line 6 *; | [X] - JONG HEO ET AL, "Ultra-low phonon energy glasses for the high-performance 1.3 mu m-window amplifiers", INSPEC, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, Database accession no. 6722523, XP002180543 [X] 1,3-12 * abstract * | [ ] - OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATION CONFERENCE. TECHNICAL DIGEST POSTCONFERENCE EDITION. TRENDS IN OPTICS AND PHOTONICS VOL.37 (IEEE CAT. NO. 00CH37079), OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATION CONFERENCE. TECHNICAL DIGEST POSTCONFERENCE EDITION. TRENDS IN OPTICS AND PH, 2000, Washington, DC, USA, Opt. Soc. America, USA, ISBN 1-55752-630-3, pages 221 - 223 vol.2 | [Y] - JONG HEO ET AL, "Dy/sup 3+/-doped Ge-Ga-S-KBr (or CsBr) glasses for the 1.3 mu m fiber amplifier materials", INSPEC, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, Database accession no. 6396685, XP002180544 [Y] 1-12 * abstract * | [ ] - OFC/IOOC'99. OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATION CONFERENCE AND THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INTEGRATED OPTICS AND OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATIONS (CAT. NO.99CH36322), OFC/IOOC'99. OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATION CONFERENCE AND THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IN, 1999, Piscataway, NJ, USA, IEEE, USA, pages 120 - 122 vol.2 | [X] - MARCHESE D ET AL, "1G4 LIFETIMES, OPTICAL AND THERMAL CHARACTERISTICS OF PR-DOPED GES2-CHALCOHALIDE GLASSES", JOURNAL OF NON-CRYSTALLINE SOLIDS, NORTH-HOLLAND PHYSICS PUBLISHING. AMSTERDAM, NL, (1996), vol. 196, ISSN 0022-3093, pages 314 - 319, XP002042717 [X] 1-12 * page 315, column 1, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0022-3093(95)00606-0 | [A] - WANG J ET AL, "HALIDE-MODIFIED GA-LA SULFIDE GLASSES WITH IMPROVED FIBER-DRAWING AND OPTICAL PROPERTIES FOR PR3+-DOPED FIBER AMPLIFIERS AT 1.3 MUM", APPLIED PHYSICS LETTERS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (19970929), vol. 71, no. 13, ISSN 0003-6951, pages 1753 - 1755, XP000725801 [A] 1-12 * page 1754, paragraph 2 - page 1755, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.119389 | Examination | US5389584 |