EP1197590 - Sample warper with detector for yarn on yarn guide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.03.2010 [2010/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUZUKI WARPER LTD. 247-31, Aioi-cho 4-chome Kiryu-shi Gunma-ken / JP | [2009/17] |
Former [2002/16] | For all designated states SUZUKI WARPER LTD. 247-31, Aioi-cho 4-chome Kiryu-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Yoshihiro 251-1, Aioi-cho 2-chome Kiryu-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | 02 /
Aihara, Takatsugu 582-15, Kawauchi-cho 3-chome Kiryu-shi, Gunma-ken / JP | [2002/16] | Representative(s) | Leinweber & Zimmermann Patentanwalts-PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Viktualienmarkt 8 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/41] | Leinweber & Zimmermann European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/16] | Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann Rosental 7, II Aufgang 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01115299.8 | 25.06.2001 | [2002/16] | Priority number, date | JP20000250723 | 22.08.2000 Original published format: JP 2000250723 | [2002/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1197590 | Date: | 17.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1197590 | Date: | 22.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.2002 | Classification | IPC: | D02H3/00 | [2002/16] | CPC: |
D02H3/04 (EP,US);
B65H63/0324 (EP,US);
B65H2701/31 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, IT [2003/02] |
Former [2002/16] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Musterzettelmaschine mit Fadenwächter am Fadenführer | [2002/16] | English: | Sample warper with detector for yarn on yarn guide | [2002/16] | French: | Ourdissoir d'échantillonnage avec détecteur de fil sur guide-fil | [2002/16] | Examination procedure | 06.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/28] | 26.01.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0375480 (SUZUKI WARPER LTD [JP]) [A] 1* page 7, line 25 - line 33 *; | [A]EP0933455 (SUZUKI WARPER LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * column 13, line 35 - line 45; figures 1-3,11,15,17 *; | [A]EP0955399 (SUZUKI WARPER LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * column 13, line 28 - line 53 * |