EP1170067 - A method of remediating heavy metal-containing soil [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2005 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.09.2009 [2009/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VOMM CHEMIPHARMA S.r.l. Via Curiel 252 20089 Rozzano MI / IT | [2002/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cerea, Guiseppina, c/o Vomm Chemipharma S.r.l. Via Curiel, 252 20089 Rozzano (Milano) / IT | [2004/17] |
Former [2002/02] | 01 /
Cerea, Guiseppina, c/o Vomm Chemiepharma S.r.l. Via Curiel, 252 20089 Rozzano (Milano) / IT | Representative(s) | Ferreccio, Rinaldo Botti & Ferrari S.p.A. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Ferreccio, Rinaldo c/o Botti & Ferrari S.r.l. Via Locatelli 5 20124 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2002/02] | Ferreccio, Rinaldo c/o Botti & Ferrari S.r.l., Via Locatelli, 5 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 01115598.3 | 28.06.2001 | [2002/02] | Priority number, date | IT2000MI01502 | 04.07.2000 Original published format: IT MI001502 | [2002/02] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1170067 | Date: | 09.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1170067 | Date: | 15.05.2002 | [2002/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1170067 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B09C1/08 | [2002/02] | CPC: |
B01J19/18 (EP,US);
B09C1/06 (EP,US);
B09C1/08 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00094 (EP,US);
B01J2219/182 (EP,US);
B01J2219/1943 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/02] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Sanierung von Schwermetalle enthaltendem Bodenmaterial | [2002/02] | English: | A method of remediating heavy metal-containing soil | [2002/02] | French: | Procédé de décontamination de sols contenant des métaux lourds | [2002/02] | Examination procedure | 24.10.2002 | Examination requested [2003/01] | 15.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 21.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.09.2004 | CH | 22.09.2004 | FI | 22.09.2004 | LI | 22.09.2004 | NL | 22.09.2004 | DK | 22.12.2004 | GR | 22.12.2004 | SE | 22.12.2004 | PT | 22.02.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
NL | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/46] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
DK | 22.12.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
CH | 22.09.2004 | ||
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
LI | 22.09.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
GR | 22.12.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/13] | AT | 22.09.2004 | |
FI | 22.09.2004 | ||
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | FI | 22.09.2004 | |
SE | 22.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 22.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4319974 (LFU LABOR FUER UMWELTANALYTIK [DE]) [A] 1-4,6 * claims 1-10 *; | [A]WO9525594 (ITEX ENTERPRISES SERVICES INC [US]) [A] 1,3 * page 3, line 7 - page 6, line 7 * * page 6, line 21 - page 26 * * figure - *; | [A]EP0728728 (VOMM CHEMIPHARMA SRL [IT]) [A] 3 * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 53 ** figure . *; | [AD]DE19547271 (ENVIRON INGENIEURGESELLSCHAFT [DE]) [AD] 1-4,6,10 * claims 1-6 * |