EP1172365 - Process for preparing 2,6-dichloropurine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 28.02.2007 [2007/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUMIKA FINE CHEMICALS Co., Ltd. 3-1-21, Utajima, Nishiyodogawa-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/03] | For all designated states SUMIKA FINE CHEMICALS Co., Ltd. 3-1-21, Utajima, Nishiyodogawa-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hayashi, Taketo, Sumika Fine Chem. Co., Ltd. Central Research Lab., 1-21, Utajima 3-chome Nishiyodogawa-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Kumazawa, Hiroharu, Sumika Fine Chem. Co., Ltd. Central Research Lab., 1-21, Utajima 3-chome Nishiyodogawa-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | 03 /
Nishikawa, Junichi, Sumika Fine Chem. Co., Ltd. Central Research Lab., 1-21, Utajima 3-chome Nishiyodogawa-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | [2002/03] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/03] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01115637.9 | 03.07.2001 | [2002/03] | Priority number, date | JP20000208450 | 10.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000208450 | JP20010179050 | 13.06.2001 Original published format: JP 2001179050 | [2002/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1172365 | Date: | 16.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1172365 | Date: | 17.03.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C07D473/40 | [2002/03] | CPC: |
C07D473/40 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/03] | Title | German: | Ein Verfahren zur Herstellung von 2,6-Dichloropurin | [2002/03] | English: | Process for preparing 2,6-dichloropurine | [2002/03] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation du 2,6-dichloropurine | [2002/03] | Examination procedure | 04.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/24] | 19.12.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 12.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 17.03.2004 | FI | 17.03.2004 | DK | 17.06.2004 | GR | 17.06.2004 | SE | 17.06.2004 | LU | 03.07.2004 | MC | 31.07.2004 | [2007/09] |
Former [2005/23] | FI | 17.03.2004 | |
DK | 17.06.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
LU | 03.07.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | FI | 17.03.2004 | |
DK | 17.06.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
MC | 31.07.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | FI | 17.03.2004 | |
DK | 17.06.2004 | ||
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 17.03.2004 | |
GR | 17.06.2004 | ||
SE | 17.06.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 17.03.2004 | |
SE | 17.06.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US3314938 (HIDEAKI KAWASHIMA, et al) [YD] 1-7 * column 1, paragraph 3 * * column 2, paragraph 7 - paragraph 8 * * claim 1 *; | [Y] - N.F.MYASOEDOV, "Addition of a tritium label to components of nucleic acids by hydrogenolysis of the corresponding precursors.", RADIOKHIMIYA, (1981), vol. 23, no. 4, pages 607 - 613, XP001028991 [Y] 1-7 * scheme on page 607; page 608, paragraph 3 * | [Y] - S.E.KEELING ET AL., "The Discovery and Synthesis of Highly Potent, A2a Receptor Agonists", BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (2000), vol. 10, pages 403 - 406, XP004189943 [Y] 1-7 * scheme 1 on page 405; page 405, column 1, line 1 - line 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(00)00017-2 | [Y] - NIIYA K ET AL, "2-(N'-ALKYLIDENEHYDRAZINO)ADENOSINES: POTENT AND SELECTIVE CORONARYVASODILATORS", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. WASHINGTON, US, (1992), vol. 35, no. 24, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 4557 - 4561, XP000918397 [Y] 1-7 * scheme I on page 4558; page 4558, column 1, paragraph 3 * * page 4561, column 1, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00102a007 | [Y] - S.B.HA ET AL., "New base-altered adenozine analogues: synthesis and affinity at adenozine A1 and A2a receptors", BIOORG. MED. CHEM. LETT., (1997), vol. 7, no. 24, pages 3085 - 3090, XP004136590 [Y] 1-7 * scheme 2 on page 3087; page 3087, line 2 - line 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(97)10177-9 |