EP1170853 - A single phase AC-DC converter having power factor control function [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 30.06.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.08.2006 [2006/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FIDELIX Y.K. 15-14 Matsuyama 2-chome Kiyose-shi Tokyo 204-0022 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/02] | For all designated states FIDELIX Y.K. 15-14 Matsuyama 2-chome Kiyose-shi, Tokyo 204-0022 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nakagawa, Shin Fidelix Y.K., 2-15-14, Matsuyama Kiyose-shi, Tokyo 204-0022 / JP | [2002/02] | Representative(s) | Isarpatent Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/02] | Reinhard - Skuhra - Weise & Partner Friedrichstrasse 31 80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01115650.2 | 03.07.2001 | [2002/02] | Priority number, date | JP20000240433 | 04.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000240433 | JP20000250341 | 17.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000250341 | JP20010200709 | 02.07.2001 Original published format: JP 2001200709 | [2002/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1170853 | Date: | 09.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1170853 | Date: | 13.02.2002 | [2002/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | H02M3/335, H02M3/28, H02M1/12, H02M1/00 | [2002/07] | CPC: |
H02M1/4208 (EP,US);
H02M1/4225 (EP,US);
H02M7/05 (EP,US);
Y02B70/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2002/02] | H02M3/335, H02M3/28, H02M1/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/02] | Title | German: | Einphasengleichstromrichter mit Leistungsfaktorregelungsfunktion | [2002/02] | English: | A single phase AC-DC converter having power factor control function | [2002/02] | French: | Convertisseur AC-DC monophasé comprenant une fonction de contrôle du facteur de puissance | [2002/02] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2002 | Examination requested [2002/41] | 20.06.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2006/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US5515257 (ISHII MASANORI [JP]) [X] 1,5,8 * the whole document * [Y] 2,6,11; | [YA]EP0942518 (FIDELIX Y K [JP]) [Y] 11 * column 7, line 1 - line 21; figure 1 *[A] 12; | [XA]US6028776 (JI HO KYUN [KR], et al) [X] 1,5 * abstract * * column 8, line 17 - line 41 * [A] 7,8; | [YA]EP0987814 (FIDELIX Y K [JP]) [Y] 2 * the whole document * [A] 3,4; | [X] - KYU CHAN LEE CHO ET AL, "Design of the feedback loop for single controller power factor correction converter", POWER ELECTRONICS SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE, 1998. PESC 98 RECORD. 29TH ANNUAL IEEE FUKUOKA, JAPAN 17-22 MAY 1998, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19980517), ISBN 0-7803-4489-8, pages 899 - 904, XP010294907 [X] 1 * the whole document * | [Y] - BAZINET ET AL, "Monolithic controller for single stage power factor correction with isolation and soft-switching", TELECOMMUNICATIONS ENERGY CONFERENCE, 1996. INTELEC '96., 18TH INTERNATIONAL BOSTON, MA, USA 6-10 OCT. 1996, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19961006), ISBN 0-7803-3507-4, pages 248 - 255, XP010204326 [Y] 6 * page 253; figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/INTLEC.1996.572412 | [A] - YIMIN JIANG ET AL, "A NOVEL SINGLE-PHASE POWER FACTOR CORRECTION SCHEME", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL APPLIED POWER ELECTRONICS CONFERENCE AND EXPOSITION (APEC). SAN DIEGO, MAR. 7 - 11, 1993, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19930307), vol. CONF. 8, ISBN 0-7803-0983-9, pages 287 - 292, XP000357907 [A] 1-4 * page 288 * |