EP1271198 - Optical filter arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.05.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2004 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.06.2004 [2004/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schott Glas Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | For all designated states Schott Glass Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vingerling, Bram Schulgasse 2 35415 Pohlheim-Hausen / DE | 02 /
Tikhonravov, Alexander V. M. Vlianova St. 21-2-16 Moscow / RU | 03 /
Thelen, Alfred Rosskopfstrasse 13 60439 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [2003/01] | Representative(s) | Herden, Andreas F. Blumbach - Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB Alexandrastraße 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2003/01] | Herden, Andreas F. Blumbach, Kramer & Partner GbR Patentanwälte Alexandrastrasse 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 01115917.5 | 29.06.2001 | [2003/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1271198 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/34 | [2003/01] | CPC: |
G02B6/29394 (EP,US);
G02B6/29361 (EP,US);
G02B6/29365 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/01] | Title | German: | Optische Filteranordnung | [2003/01] | English: | Optical filter arrangement | [2003/01] | French: | Dispositif à filtre optique | [2003/01] | Examination procedure | 12.06.2003 | Examination requested [2003/33] | 03.05.2004 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2004/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1098212 (JDS UNIPHASE INC [CA]) [X] 1,7,33,37 * abstract *; | [A]EP1065813 (MARCONI COMM LTD [GB]) [A] 1,33 * abstract * |