EP1136944 - Non-contact type ic card and method and apparatus for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.01.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.02.2005 [2005/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takahira, Kenichi c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K., 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | 02 /
Ohbuchi, Jun c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K., 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | 03 /
Murasawa, Yasuhiro c/o Mitsubishi Denki K.K., 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100 / JP | [2001/39] | Representative(s) | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/39] | Leson, Thomas Johannes Alois, Dipl.-Ing. Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner GbR, TBK-Patent, Bavariaring 4 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01116097.5 | 21.12.1995 | [2001/39] | Priority number, date | JP19940325454 | 27.12.1994 Original published format: JP 32545494 | JP19950331977 | 20.12.1995 Original published format: JP 33197795 | [2001/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1136944 | Date: | 26.09.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.08.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077 | [2001/39] | CPC: |
G06K19/07718 (EP);
B42D25/45 (KR);
B42D25/00 (KR);
G06K19/0722 (EP);
G06K19/077 (EP);
G06K19/07749 (EP);
G06K19/07779 (EP);
H01L24/97 (EP);
H05K3/284 (EP);
H05K3/321 (EP);
H05K3/4046 (EP);
H05K3/4652 (EP);
H01L2224/16225 (EP);
H01L2224/97 (EP);
H01L2924/01005 (EP);
H01L2924/01006 (EP);
H01L2924/01013 (EP);
H01L2924/01029 (EP);
H01L2924/01033 (EP);
H01L2924/01047 (EP);
H01L2924/01074 (EP);
H01L2924/01078 (EP);
H01L2924/01079 (EP);
H01L2924/01082 (EP);
H01L2924/14 (EP);
H01L2924/15153 (EP);
H01L2924/1517 (EP);
H01L2924/19041 (EP);
H05K1/189 (EP);
H05K2201/0195 (EP);
H05K2201/10303 (EP);
H05K2203/0191 (EP);
H05K2203/063 (EP);
H05K2203/1453 (EP);
H05K3/386 (EP);
H05K3/4626 (EP);
H05K3/4655 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/97, H01L2224/81 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/39] | Title | German: | Kontaktlose IC Karte und Verfahren und Vorrichtung zu ihrer Herstellung | [2001/39] | English: | Non-contact type ic card and method and apparatus for manufacturing the same | [2001/39] | French: | Carte IC sans contact et méthode et appareil pour sa fabrication | [2001/39] | Examination procedure | 10.09.2001 | Examination requested [2001/45] | 19.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.01.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.04.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/08] | 24.09.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2005/08] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95120242.3 / EP0720123 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0481776 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-18* the whole document *; | [X]FR2695594 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1-18 * the whole document * |