Designated contracting states | AT | | BE | | CH | Lapse: 31.07.2004 | DE | | DK | | FI | Lapse: 29.10.2003 | FR | | GB | Lapse: 29.10.2003 | IT | Lapse: 29.10.2003 | LI | Lapse: 31.07.2004 | LU | Lapse: 30.07.2004 | NL | Lapse: 29.10.2003 | SE | Lapse: 29.01.2004 | Examination procedure | 08.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | European patent granted | 29.10.2003 | Opposition procedure | 15.04.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | | Appeal following opposition | 22.11.2011 | APPEAL FILED | 17.01.2012 | APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED | 23.10.2014 | APPEAL RESULT | INPADOC data Tooltip | The EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority. | Event date: | 08.01.2003 | | Event description: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20021121 | | Event date: | 24.07.2002 | | Event description: | DESIGNATION FEES PAID | Free Format Text: | AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE | | Event date: | 07.11.2001 | | Event description: | DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION | Ref Document Number: | 894909 | Country of Ref Document: | EP | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Event date: | 07.11.2001 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE | | Event date: | 03.04.2002 | | Event description: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20020125 | | Event date: | 25.06.2003 | | Event description: | TITLE (CORRECTION) | Free Format Text: | MINERALWOOL INSULATING ELEMENT AND ITS METHOD OF PRODUCTION | | Event date: | 29.10.2003 | | Event description: | DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION | Ref Document Number: | 0894909 | Country of Ref Document: | EP | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Event date: | 29.10.2003 | | Event description: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH DE DK FI FR GB IT LI LU NL SE | | Event date: | 29.10.2003 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | Free Format Text: | NOT ENGLISH | | Event date: | 31.10.2003 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Event date: | 04.12.2003 | | Event description: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 59810045 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 20031204 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Event date: | 08.03.2004 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK T3 | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS | | Event date: | 01.04.2004 | | Event description: | NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT | | Event date: | 28.04.2004 | | Event description: | GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977 [NO TRANSLATION FILED] | Effective DATE: | 20031029 | | Event date: | 08.09.2004 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | DEUTSCHE ROCKWOOL MINERALWOLL GMBH & CO. OHG | Effective DATE: | 20040713 | | Event date: | 06.08.2004 | | Event description: | FR: TRANSLATION FILED | | Event date: | 15.03.2005 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PL | Code Expl.: | -PATENT CEASED | | Event date: | 17.08.2007 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR CD | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME | | Event date: | 31.07.2004 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20040731 | | Event date: | 29.10.2003 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20031029 | | Event date: | 31.07.2004 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20040731 | | Event date: | 30.07.2004 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20040730 | | Event date: | 29.10.2003 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20031029 | | Event date: | 29.01.2004 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20040129 | | Event date: | 06.05.2009 | | Event description: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (PATENT OWNER DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | KNAUF INSULATION GMBH | | Event date: | 30.10.2015 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20150730 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 30.10.2015 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Payment DATE: | 20150730 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 30.11.2015 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Payment DATE: | 20150730 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 30.11.2015 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Payment DATE: | 20150731 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 30.11.2015 | | Event description: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20150730 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 30.07.2015 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Event date: | 10.08.2016 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS TERMINATED | Effective DATE: | 20160402 | | Event date: | 30.12.2016 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20160731 | | Event date: | 20.02.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK EBP | Code Expl.: | -EP PATENT LAPSED | Effective DATE: | 20170131 | | Event date: | 15.03.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT MM01 253151 AT T | Code Expl.: | -LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES | Effective DATE: | 20160730 | | Event date: | 01.02.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R119 59810045 DE | Code Expl.: | -APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | | Event date: | 28.04.2017 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20160801 | | Event date: | 28.04.2017 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20170201 | | Event date: | 28.04.2017 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR ST | Code Expl.: | -NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE | Effective DATE: | 20170331 | | Event date: | 31.05.2017 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20160730 | | Event date: | 31.01.2018 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20160731 | | Event date: | 02.04.2016 | | Event description: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R100 59810045 DE | Code Expl.: | +EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT UNAMENDED NOW FINAL | | Event date: | 29.10.2003 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT;WARNING: LAPSES OF ITALIAN PATENTS WITH EFFECTIVE DATE BEFORE 2007 MAY HAVE OCCURRED AT ANY TIME BEFORE 2007. THE CORRECT EFFECTIVE DATE MAY BE DIFFERENT FROM THE ONE RECORDED. | Effective DATE: | 20031029 | | Event date: | 29.10.2003 | | Event description: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20031029 | | Event date: | 24.10.2014 | | Event description: | APPEAL PROCEDURE CLOSED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNNOA9O | | Event date: | 21.01.2012 | | Event description: | DATE OF RECEIPT OF STATEMENT OF GROUNDS OF APPEAL RECORDED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNNOA3O | | Event date: | 25.11.2011 | | Event description: | APPEAL REFERENCE MODIFIED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSCREFNO | | Event date: | 25.11.2011 | | Event description: | APPEAL REFERENCE RECORDED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNREFNO | | Event date: | 25.11.2011 | | Event description: | DATE OF RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF APPEAL RECORDED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNNOA2O | | Event date: | 12.09.2003 | | Event description: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Event date: | 21.08.2003 | | Event description: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Event date: | 14.05.2003 | | Event description: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA | | Event date: | 21.09.2001 | | Event description: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Event date: | 08.07.2016 | | Event description: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: OPPOSITION PROCEDURE CLOSED | | Event date: | 08.07.2016 | | Event description: | TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE: DATE OF LEGAL EFFECT PUBLISHED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009276 | | Event date: | 18.03.2016 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION WITHDRAWN | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009264 | | Event date: | 16.03.2016 | | Event description: | TERMINATION OF OPPOSITION PROCEDURE: DECISION DESPATCHED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOPC1 | | Event date: | 27.03.2015 | | Event description: | REPLY TO EXAMINATION REPORT IN OPPOSITION RECEIVED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNORE3 | | Event date: | 11.12.2014 | | Event description: | EXAMINATION REPORT IN OPPOSITION DESPATCHED + TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNORE2 | | Event date: | 22.09.2011 | | Event description: | COMMUNICATION DESPATCHED THAT PATENT IS REVOKED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNREV1 | | Event date: | 19.09.2008 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION DATA, OPPONENT'S DATA OR THAT OF THE OPPONENT'S REPRESENTATIVE MODIFIED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009299OPPO | | Event date: | 07.09.2005 | | Event description: | REPLY OF PATENT PROPRIETOR TO NOTICE(S) OF OPPOSITION RECEIVED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS3 | | Event date: | 30.06.2005 | | Event description: | NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND REQUEST TO FILE OBSERVATION + TIME LIMIT SENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS2 | | Event date: | 25.02.2005 | | Event description: | NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND REQUEST TO FILE OBSERVATION + TIME LIMIT SENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS2 | | Event date: | 31.08.2004 | | Event description: | NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND REQUEST TO FILE OBSERVATION + TIME LIMIT SENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS2 | | Event date: | 23.07.2004 | | Event description: | OPPOSITION FILED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009260 | | Event date: | 20.07.2004 | | Event description: | UNPUBLISHED CHANGE TO OPPONENT DATA | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS OPPO | |