EP1195213 - Iron-based powders for powder metallurgy [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 24.02.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.02.2006 | Revocation of patent | published on 12.04.2006 [2006/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/49] | For all designated states JFE Steel Corporation 2-3, Uchisaiwai-cho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2002/15] | For all designated states Kawasaki Steel Corporation 1-28 Kitahonmachidori 1-chome, Chuo-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo 651-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Uenosono, Satoshi, c/o Kawasaki Steel Corporation 1, Kawasakicho, Chuo-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 260-0835 / JP | 02 /
Ozaki, Yukiko, c/o Kawasaki Steel Corporation 1, Kawasakicho, Chuo-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 260-0835 / JP | [2002/15] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/15] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01116482.9 | 06.07.2001 | [2002/15] | Priority number, date | JP20000307802 | 06.10.2000 Original published format: JP 2000307802 | [2002/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1195213 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1195213 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B22F1/00, C22C33/02 | [2002/15] | CPC: |
C22C33/0207 (EP,US);
B22F1/052 (EP,US);
B22F1/10 (EP,US);
B22F1/103 (EP,US);
B22F1/108 (EP,US);
B22F2998/00 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/00, B22F1/108 (EP,US);
B22F2998/10, B22F9/082, B22F1/09, B22F1/12, B22F1/148 (EP,US);
B22F2999/00, B22F1/09, B22F1/12, B22F1/148, B22F1/10 (US,EP);
B22F2999/00, B22F1/09, B22F1/12, B22F9/082, B22F9/22 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | DE, SE [2003/01] |
Former [2002/15] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Eisenbasispulver für pulvermetallurgische Anwendungen | [2002/15] | English: | Iron-based powders for powder metallurgy | [2002/15] | French: | Poudre à base de fer pour la métallurgie des poudres | [2002/15] | Examination procedure | 19.07.2002 | Examination requested [2002/38] | 23.08.2002 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 04.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
24.03.2004
01.04.2004
ADMISSIBLE Höganäs AB 263 83 Höganäs / SE Opponent's representative Thylén, Eva Matilda, et al, et al Awapatent AB Box 1066 251 10 Helsingborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
24.03.2004
01.04.2004
ADMISSIBLE Höganäs AB 263 83 Höganäs / SE Opponent's representative Thylén, Eva Matilda, et al, et al AWAPATENT AB, Berga Allé 1 254 52 Helsingborg / SE | 04.05.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 15.09.2004 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.09.2005 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.09.2005 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2006/15] | 09.11.2005 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 09.11.2005 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 26.09.2003 | [2004/23] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH062007 ; | [A]US5429792 (LUK SYDNEY [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 3, lines 34-57 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940405), vol. 018, no. 193, Database accession no. (M - 1588), & JP06002007 A 19940111 (KOBE STEEL LTD) [A] * abstract * |