Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
15.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.08.2005 [2005/35] |
23.07.2004 | (Expected) grant | published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] |
13.07.2004 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
15.06.2004 | New entry: Payment of fee for grant | |
15.06.2004 | New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing | |
12.02.2004 | Deletion: Fee payment for extension state | |
12.02.2004 | Deletion: Withdrawal of extension state | |
11.02.2004 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
17.10.2003 | Definitive list of designations | published on 03.12.2003 [2003/49] |
07.10.2003 | New entry: Reply to examination report | |
16.07.2003 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.05.2003 | First examination report | |
17.05.2003 | Examination report or reply | |
15.04.2003 | Request for examination filed | published on 28.05.2003 [2003/22] |
24.01.2003 | Publication of search report | published on 12.03.2003 [2003/11] |
24.01.2003 | Change - classification | published on 12.03.2003 [2003/11] |
30.11.2001 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 16.01.2002 [2002/03] |