EP1172546 - Device for cooling compressed air in a utility vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.07.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.08.2005 [2005/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Nutzfahrzeuge Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 50 06 20 80976 München / DE | [2002/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kolland, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing. Fabrikstrasse 36 81245 München / DE | [2002/03] | Application number, filing date | 01116495.1 | 06.07.2001 | [2002/03] | Priority number, date | DE2000134480 | 15.07.2000 Original published format: DE 10034480 | [2002/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1172546 | Date: | 16.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1172546 | Date: | 12.03.2003 | [2003/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1172546 | Date: | 08.09.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F02M31/04, F02M35/10, B60T17/00 | [2003/11] | CPC: |
F02M31/20 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/03] | F02M31/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, NL, SE [2003/49] |
Former [2002/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Kühlung der Druckluft in einem Nutzfahrzeug | [2002/03] | English: | Device for cooling compressed air in a utility vehicle | [2002/03] | French: | Dispositif pour refroidir l'air comprimé dans un véhicule utilitaire | [2002/03] | Examination procedure | 29.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/22] | 21.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0504596 (KNORR BREMSE AG [DE]) [A] 1,4 * abstract * * column 3, line 14 - line 36; figure 1 *; | [A]DE4202077 (AUDI AG [DE]); | [A]DE19525541 (SCANIA CV AB [SE]) [A] 1,4 * column 2, line 45 - column 4, line 18; figures 1,2 * * abstract * |