EP1176441 - Multifiber optical array ferrule arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.06.2004 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.08.2004 [2004/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F.C.I. - Framatome Connectors International Tour Framatome, 1, place de la Coupole 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | For all designated states F.C.I. - Framatome Connectors International Tour Framatome, 1, place de la Coupole 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cowley, Simon S. 3822 Pamay Drive Mechanicsburg, PA 17055 / US | 02 /
Ngo, Hung Viet 4415 St. Andrews Way Harrisburg, PA 17112 / US | [2002/05] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | Beetz & Partner Patentanwälte Steinsdorfstrasse 10 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01116657.6 | 13.07.2001 | [2002/05] | Priority number, date | US20000624651 | 25.07.2000 Original published format: US 624651 | [2002/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1176441 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1176441 | Date: | 12.05.2004 | [2004/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.2004 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/38 | [2002/05] | CPC: |
G02B6/3839 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Anordnung und Endstück für ein optisches Faser-Array | [2002/05] | English: | Multifiber optical array ferrule arrangement | [2002/05] | French: | Dispositif et embout pour matrice de fibres optiques | [2002/05] | Examination procedure | 03.02.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/33] | 09.03.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/33] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPH05307132 ; | [XY]JPH05307133 ; | [XY]US4046454 (PUGH III WILLIAM EDWARD) [X] 1-6,11-15 * column 3, line 47 - line 50; figure 2 * [Y] 7-10 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940224), vol. 018, no. 117, Database accession no. (P - 1699), & JP05307132 A 19931119 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD:THE;OTHERS: 01) [X] 1,3-6,11-15 * abstract * * figures 1,4 * [Y] 7-10 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940224), vol. 018, no. 117, Database accession no. (P - 1699), & JP05307133 A 19931119 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD:THE;OTHERS: 01) [X] 1,3-6,11-15 * abstract * * figures 1,3 * [Y] 7-10 |