EP1180448 - Child seat base [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.02.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 02.06.2010 [2010/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TAKATA CORPORATION 4-30, Roppongi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8510 / JP | [2009/14] |
Former [2002/08] | For all designated states TAKATA CORPORATION 4-30, Roppongi 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 106-8510 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hiramatsu, Koji Takata Corporation, 4-30 Roppongi Minato-ku, Tokyo 106-8510 / JP | 02 /
Yamanishi, Takahiro Takata Corporation, 4-30 Roppongi Minato-ku, Tokyo 106-8510 / JP | [2002/08] | Representative(s) | Banzer, Hans-Jörg, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/08] | Banzer, Hans-Jörg, Dipl.-Ing., et al Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01116748.3 | 19.07.2001 | [2002/08] | Priority number, date | JP20000241519 | 09.08.2000 Original published format: JP 2000241519 | [2002/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1180448 | Date: | 20.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1180448 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/28 | [2002/08] | CPC: |
B60N3/063 (EP);
B60N2/2824 (EP);
B60N2/286 (EP);
B60N2/2872 (EP);
B60N2/2887 (EP);
F16B7/0493 (EP);
F16B9/023 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2002/45] |
Former [2002/08] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Träger für einen Kindersitz | [2002/08] | English: | Child seat base | [2002/08] | French: | Support d'un siège pour enfant | [2002/08] | Examination procedure | 05.06.2002 | Examination requested [2002/32] | 09.09.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 09.03.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP07104560.3 / EP1800939 | EP08008764.6 / EP1953033 | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 01.07.2009 | FR | 31.07.2009 | [2010/22] |
Former [2009/52] | SE | 01.07.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2348835 (PEUGEOT [FR]) [Y] 3 * page 2, line 8 - page 4, line 5; figure 1 *; | [XA]EP0164909 (ASE UK LTD [GB]) [X] 2 * page 9, line 10 - page 11, line 15; figure 4 * [A] 3; | [X]DE9208778U (SCHRAEDER MARGARETE [DE]) [X] 1 * page 8, line 12 - page 9, line 2; figure 8 *; | [XA]FR2741847 (BABY RELAX [FR]) [X] 1,2 * page 8, line 21 - page 8, line 26; figure 1 * [A] 3; | [XA]EP0791500 (CAPPONI GIUSEPPE [IT]) [X] 2 * column 2, line 22 - column 3, line 48; figures 4,7 * [A] 1,3; | [X]EP0813992 (SCHRAEDER MARGARETE [DE]) [X] 2* column 11, line 11 - column 11, line 27; figure 6 *; | [XY]DE29812319U (KEIPER RECARO GMBH CO [DE]) [X] 1,2 * the whole document * [Y] 3 |