EP1172287 - Snow removal machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.09.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.09.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.11.2006 [2006/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2005/47] |
Former [2002/03] | For all designated states HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ito, Tomoki, c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Kono, Masakatsu, c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 03 /
Yamamoto, Takahiro, c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 04 /
Shimizu, Norikazu, c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | [2002/03] | Representative(s) | Prechtel, Jörg, et al C/o Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Richard-Strauss-Straße 80 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/03] | Prechtel, Jörg, Dipl.-Phys. Dr., et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01116845.7 | 10.07.2001 | [2002/03] | Priority number, date | JP20000210828 | 12.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000210828 | JP20000216311 | 17.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000216311 | [2002/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1172287 | Date: | 16.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/03] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1172287 | Date: | 10.03.2004 | [2004/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1172287 | Date: | 23.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2004 | Classification | IPC: | E01H5/04, B62D55/088 | [2004/11] | CPC: |
B62D55/0882 (EP);
E01H5/04 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/03] | B62D55/088 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, LI, SE [2004/49] |
Former [2002/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichting zum Schneeräumen | [2002/03] | English: | Snow removal machine | [2002/03] | French: | Dispositif de déneigement | [2002/03] | Examination procedure | 22.04.2004 | Examination requested [2004/25] | 17.06.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.06.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3723989 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-3,6,7 * column 6, line 35 - line 45 * * figure 2 *; | [Y]US5725292 (KEEDY DAVE E [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,6,7 * column 3, line 15 - line 25; figures 2,3 * * column 3, line 43 - line 48; figure 5 * * column 4, line 55 - line 63; figures 7-9 *; | [A]DE1932987U (DIEHL K G [DE]) [A] 1-3 * page 2, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * * page 3, paragraph 1; figures 1,2 *; | [A]JPH08302636 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970331), vol. 1997, no. 03, & JP08302636 A 19961119 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [A] 1 * abstract * |