EP1179659 - Arrangement for ignition of combustible gas mixture for the exhaust gas system of an internal combustion engine and corresponding exhaust gas system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.01.2006 [2006/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr.Ing. H.C. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | For all designated states AUDI AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2005/04] | For all designated states Dr.Ing. h.c.F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | ||
For all designated states AUDI AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | |||
For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | |||
For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | |||
Former [2002/07] | For all designated states Dr.Ing. h.c.F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | ||
For all designated states AUDI AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | |||
For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | |||
For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Huynh, Ngoc-Hoa Hoffmannstrasse 99 71229 Leonberg / DE | 02 /
Salzer, Lorenz Bismarkstrasse 15 71277 Rutesheim / DE | 03 /
Gerl, Peter Im Göbel 4 73732 Esslingen / DE | [2002/07] | Application number, filing date | 01116880.4 | 11.07.2001 | [2002/07] | Priority number, date | DE2000138743 | 09.08.2000 Original published format: DE 10038743 | [2002/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1179659 | Date: | 13.02.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1179659 | Date: | 16.07.2003 | [2003/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1179659 | Date: | 26.01.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.06.2003 | Classification | IPC: | F01N3/38, F01N3/20, F01N3/36 | [2002/07] | CPC: |
F01N3/204 (EP,US);
F01N13/009 (EP,US);
F01N3/2807 (EP,US);
F01N3/2882 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2004/15] |
Former [2002/07] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Entzündung brennbaren Gasgemisches für die Abgasanlage einer Brennkraftmaschine und entsprechende Abgasanlage | [2002/07] | English: | Arrangement for ignition of combustible gas mixture for the exhaust gas system of an internal combustion engine and corresponding exhaust gas system | [2002/07] | French: | Ensemble pour allumage des gaz combustibles pour un système d'échappement d'un moteur à combustion interne et système d'échappement correspondant | [2002/07] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2004 | Examination requested [2004/13] | 09.03.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2280128 (FORD MOTOR CO [GB]) [A] 1,8 * abstract *; | [A]US5342591 (PFEFFERLE WILLIAM C [US]) [A] 1,7 * column 5, line 5 - column 5, line 44; figures 1,2; claims 1-12 *; | [A]US5720609 (PFEFFERLE WILLIAM CHARLES [US]) [A] 1,7 * abstract *; | [A]GB2134407 (FORD MOTOR CO) [A] 1,7 * page 3, line 11 - page 3, line 20; figure 1 * |