EP1174164 - Container with energy supply and/or air conditioning [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.09.2009 [2009/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EADS Deutschland GmbH Willy-Messerschmitt-Strasse 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/36] | For all designated states EADS Deutschland GmbH Willy-Messerschmitt-Strasse 85521 Ottobrunn / DE | ||
Former [2002/04] | For all designated states DORNIER GmbH 88039 Friedrichshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fritzsche, Albert, Dr. Am Kreuzgarten 1 88677 Markdorf / DE | 02 /
Ziegler, Karl Lindauer Weg 12 88690 Unteruhldingen / DE | [2002/04] | Representative(s) | Meel, Thomas Airbus Defence and Space GmbH Patentabteilung 88039 Friedrichshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/39] | Meel, Thomas EADS Deutschland GmbH Patentabteilung DSLAIP1 88039 Friedrichshafen / DE | ||
Former [2004/45] | Meel, Thomas Patentassessor c/o EADS Deutschland GmbH Patentabteilung FCL6 88039 Friedrichshafen / DE | ||
Former [2004/36] | Meel, Thomas Patentassessor, c/o EADS Deutschland GmbH Patentabteilung, FCL6 88039 Friedrichshafen / DE | ||
Former [2002/04] | Meel, Thomas Dornier GmbH L H G 88039 Friedrichshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 01116890.3 | 11.07.2001 | [2002/04] | Priority number, date | DE2000135563 | 21.07.2000 Original published format: DE 10035563 | [2002/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1174164 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1174164 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A62B13/00, E04H9/10 | [2002/04] | CPC: |
F24F3/00 (EP);
F24F2221/44 (EP);
F25B27/00 (EP);
F25D11/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/04] | Title | German: | Container mit Energieversorgung und/oder Klimaanlage | [2002/04] | English: | Container with energy supply and/or air conditioning | [2002/04] | French: | Container avec alimentation en energie et/ou conditionnement d'air | [2002/04] | Examination procedure | 18.04.2002 | Examination requested [2002/26] | 06.04.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.05.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 15.12.2004 | FI | 15.12.2004 | IE | 15.12.2004 | IT | 15.12.2004 | TR | 15.12.2004 | DK | 15.03.2005 | GR | 15.03.2005 | SE | 15.03.2005 | PT | 15.05.2005 | AT | 11.07.2005 | CY | 11.07.2005 | LU | 11.07.2005 | BE | 31.07.2005 | CH | 31.07.2005 | LI | 31.07.2005 | MC | 31.07.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/36] | ES | 15.12.2004 | |
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
IT | 15.12.2004 | ||
TR | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
SE | 15.03.2005 | ||
AT | 11.07.2005 | ||
CY | 11.07.2005 | ||
LU | 11.07.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
CH | 31.07.2005 | ||
LI | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/26] | ES | 15.12.2004 | |
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
TR | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
SE | 15.03.2005 | ||
AT | 11.07.2005 | ||
CY | 11.07.2005 | ||
LU | 11.07.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
CH | 31.07.2005 | ||
LI | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/20] | ES | 15.12.2004 | |
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
TR | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
SE | 15.03.2005 | ||
AT | 11.07.2005 | ||
CY | 11.07.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
CH | 31.07.2005 | ||
LI | 31.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2007/09] | ES | 15.12.2004 | |
FI | 15.12.2004 | ||
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
TR | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
SE | 15.03.2005 | ||
AT | 11.07.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
CH | 31.07.2005 | ||
LI | 31.07.2005 | ||
LU | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/52] | FI | 15.12.2004 | |
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
TR | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
AT | 11.07.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
CH | 31.07.2005 | ||
LI | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/51] | FI | 15.12.2004 | |
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
TR | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
CH | 31.07.2005 | ||
LI | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 15.12.2004 | |
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
BE | 31.07.2005 | ||
CH | 31.07.2005 | ||
LI | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/33] | FI | 15.12.2004 | |
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
CH | 31.07.2005 | ||
LI | 31.07.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/28] | FI | 15.12.2004 | |
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
MC | 31.07.2005 | ||
Former [2006/12] | FI | 15.12.2004 | |
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
DK | 15.03.2005 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/46] | FI | 15.12.2004 | |
IE | 15.12.2004 | ||
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/26] | FI | 15.12.2004 | |
GR | 15.03.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 15.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3191517 (SOLZMAN ISEL I) [A] 1,3 * column 1, line 64 - column 4, line 32; figure 2 *; | [X]CH577833 (SVEADIESEL AB) [X] 1,2 * column 2, line 8 - column 4, line 11; figure 1 *; | [A]EP0064892 (SGG BTPI [FR]) [A] 1,3 * page 5, line 7 - page 6, line 25; figure 2 *; | [A]DE3726114 (BONG HANS DIPL ING [DE]) [A] 1,3 * column W *; | [A]EP0542707 (VENTILATORVERKEN AB [SE]) [A] 1* column 3, line 5 - column 4, line 57; figure 1 *; | [X]DE4328810 (WEISS UMWELTTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1 * column 1, line 3 - column 4, line 50; figure 1 * |