EP1170380 - Methods for determining anti-viral drug susceptibility and resistance and anti-viral drug screening [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2002/02] | Compositions and methods for determining anti-viral drug susceptibility and resistance and anti-viral drug screening | ||
[2009/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2010 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Monogram BioSciences, Inc. 345 Oyster Point Boulevard South San Francisco, CA 94080-1913 / US | [2009/45] |
Former [2006/32] | For all designated states Monogram Biosciences, Inc. 345 Oyster Point Boulevard South San Francisco, CA 94080-1913 / US | ||
Former [2002/02] | For all designated states Virologic, Inc. 270 East Grand Avenue South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Capon, Daniel J. 90 Woodbridge Road Hillsborough, CA 94010 / US | 02 /
Petropoulous, Christos, John 415 Garcia Avenue Half Moon Bay, CA 94019 / US | [2004/01] |
Former [2002/02] | 01 /
Capon, Daniel J. 90 Woodbridge Road Hillsborough, CA 94010 / US | ||
02 /
Petropoulous, Christos, John 415 Garcia Avenue Half Moon Bay, CA 94019 / US | Representative(s) | Tollervey, Rebecca Marie, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/23] | Tollervey, Rebecca Marie, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2006/22] | Hodsdon, Stephen James Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [2006/15] | Ricker, Mathias, et al Jones Day, Rechtsanwälte, Attorneys-at-Law, Patentanwälte, Prinzregentenstrasse 11 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2002/02] | Denison, Christopher Marcus, et al Mewburn Ellis York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 01117002.4 | 29.01.1997 | [2002/02] | Priority number, date | US19960593009 | 29.01.1996 Original published format: US 593009 | [2002/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1170380 | Date: | 09.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1170380 | Date: | 02.05.2003 | [2003/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1170380 | Date: | 04.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2003 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C12Q1/70, C12Q1/02, C12N15/64 | [2002/02] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/02] | Extension states | AL | 31.07.2001 | LT | 31.07.2001 | LV | 31.07.2001 | RO | 31.07.2001 | SI | 31.07.2001 | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bestimmung antiviraler Wirkstoff Suszeptibilität und Resistenz sowie antivirales Wirkstoff-Screening | [2009/21] | English: | Methods for determining anti-viral drug susceptibility and resistance and anti-viral drug screening | [2009/21] | French: | Méthodes déterminant une susceptibilité et résistance anti-virale et screening pour des agents anti-viraux | [2009/21] |
Former [2002/02] | Zusammensetzungen und Verfahren zur Bestimmung antiviraler Wirkstoff Suszeptibilität und Resistenz sowie antivirales Wirkstoff-Screening | ||
Former [2002/02] | Compositions and methods for determining anti-viral drug susceptibility and resistance and anti-viral drug screening | ||
Former [2002/02] | Compositions et méthodes déterminant une susceptibilité et résistance anti-virale et screening pour des agents anti-viraux | Examination procedure | 31.10.2003 | Examination requested [2004/01] | 07.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 17.07.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 17.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP97907549.6 / EP0852626 | Opposition(s) | 05.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.11.2009 | BE | 04.11.2009 | DK | 04.11.2009 | FI | 04.11.2009 | IT | 04.11.2009 | NL | 04.11.2009 | SE | 04.11.2009 | IE | 29.01.2010 | LU | 29.01.2010 | CH | 31.01.2010 | LI | 31.01.2010 | GR | 05.02.2010 | ES | 15.02.2010 | PT | 04.03.2010 | MC | 31.05.2010 | [2012/44] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
IT | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
IE | 29.01.2010 | ||
LU | 29.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/14] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
IT | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
IE | 29.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
IE | 29.01.2010 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
MC | 31.05.2010 | ||
Former [2010/47] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2010 | ||
LI | 31.01.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/35] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/31] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
BE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 04.11.2009 | |
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 04.11.2009 | |
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
PT | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | ES | 15.02.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0291893 (DU PONT [US]) [Y] 1,3-5,9,10,13,17,18,20-22,29,31-33,36,46,65,66,70,73,75,77-79,81,82 * the whole document *; | [XY]EP0361749 (DANA FARBER CANCER INST INC [US]) [X] 1,3-8,10,14,17-22,29,31-33,35,36,46-50 * the whole document * [Y] 51-54,65-73,75,77-79,81,82; | [XY]EP0372904 (UNIV OSAKA RES FOUND [JP]) [X] 17,18,21 * the whole document * [Y] 1,3,5,9,29,31-33,65,66,70,73,75,77-79,81,82; | [A]EP0414475 (CHIRON CORP [US]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]FR2700169 (TRANSGENE SA [FR]) [A] * the whole document *; | [Y]WO9505453 (SYSTEMIX INC [US], et al) [Y] 1,29,51-54,65,75,79 * the whole document *; | [DA]WO9522622 (UNIV WASHINGTON [US]) [DA] * the whole document *; | [XY]WO9529703 (NABEL GARY J [US], et al) [X] 17,18,20,21 * abstract * * page 2, line 1 - line 15 * * page 31, line 18 - page 35, line 4 * * page 40, line 5 - page 41, line 25; claims 1-24 * [Y] 1,3-8,10,13,14,16,19,29,31-33,35,36,46-50,65,66,70,72; | [XY]WO9530763 (VIAGENE INC [US]) [X] 24-26 * abstract * [Y] 1,3,5-8,14,16-22,29,31-33,35,48-51,67-72; | [T]US5837464 (CAPON DANIEL [US], et al) [T] 1-82 * the whole document *; | [T]WO9906597 (VIROLOGIC INC [US]) [T] 1-82* the whole document *; | [X] - KELLAM P ET AL, "RECOMBINANT VIRUS ASSAY: A RAPID, PHENOTYPIC ASSAY FOR ASSESSMENT OF DRUG SUSCEPTIBILITY OF HUMAN IMMUNODEFIENCY VIRUS TYPE 1 ISOLATES", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (199401), vol. 38, no. 1, ISSN 0066-4804, pages 23 - 30, XP000952459 [X] 1,3,17,18,29,31,51-54,65,75,79 * the whole document * | [X] - MORGENSTERN J P ET AL, "ADVANCED MAMMALIAN GENE TRANSFER: HIGH TITRE RETROVIRAL VECTORS WITH MULTIPLE DRUG SELECTION MARKERS AND A COMPLEMENTARY HELPER -FREE PACKAGING CELL LINE", NUCLEIC ACIDS RESEARCH, (19900101), vol. 18, no. 12, pages 3587 - 3596, XP002073969 [X] 17-22,24-26 * the whole document * | [DXY] - KELLAM P ET AL., "Fifth mutation in human immunodeficiency virus type 1 reverse transcriptase contributes to the development of high-level resistance to zidovudine", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 1934 - 1938, XP002107338 [DX] 17,18,20 * abstract * * page 1934, column 1, paragraph 1 - page 1935, column 1, paragraph 5; figures 1,4 * [Y] 1,3,29,31,46,47,51-54,65,66,70,72,75,77-79,81,82 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.89.5.1934 | [A] - SALTARELLI M J ET AL, "THE CAEV TAT GENE TRANS-ACTIVATES THE VIRAL LTR AND IS NECESSARY FOR EFFICIENT VIRAL REPLICATION", VIROLOGY, ACADEMIC PRESS,ORLANDO, US, (1993), vol. 197, ISSN 0042-6822, pages 35 - 44, XP001059850 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/viro.1993.1564 |