EP1175819 - Agricultural working machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CLAAS Saulgau GmbH Zeppelinstrasse 2 88348 Bad Saulgau / DE | [2009/01] |
Former [2002/05] | For all designated states CLAAS SAULGAU GMBH Zeppelinstrasse 2 88348 Saulgau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prenzler, Jürgen Löhlebühl 2 88377 Unterwaldhausen / DE | [2002/05] | Application number, filing date | 01117068.5 | 13.07.2001 | [2002/05] | Priority number, date | DE2000136029 | 24.07.2000 Original published format: DE 10036029 | [2002/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1175819 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1175819 | Date: | 14.07.2004 | [2004/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1175819 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2009/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2004 | Classification | IPC: | A01B73/02, A01B73/04 | [2004/14] | CPC: |
A01B73/02 (EP);
A01B73/042 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2002/05] | A01B73/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2002/05] | Title | German: | Landwirtschaftliche Arbeitsmaschine | [2002/05] | English: | Agricultural working machine | [2002/05] | French: | Machine agricole de travail | [2002/05] | Examination procedure | 14.01.2005 | Examination requested [2005/12] | 19.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.10.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/50] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 13.11.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 13.11.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | 13.12.2006 | Request for further processing filed | 13.12.2006 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.12.2006 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 31.12.2008 | FI | 31.12.2008 | IE | 31.12.2008 | IT | 31.12.2008 | NL | 31.12.2008 | TR | 31.12.2008 | SE | 31.03.2009 | GR | 01.04.2009 | ES | 11.04.2009 | PT | 01.06.2009 | GB | 13.07.2009 | LU | 13.07.2009 | BE | 31.07.2009 | CH | 31.07.2009 | LI | 31.07.2009 | MC | 31.07.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/21] | FI | 31.12.2008 | |
IE | 31.12.2008 | ||
IT | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
GR | 01.04.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
GB | 13.07.2009 | ||
LU | 13.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2011/14] | FI | 31.12.2008 | |
IE | 31.12.2008 | ||
IT | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
GR | 01.04.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
GB | 13.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/47] | FI | 31.12.2008 | |
IE | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
GR | 01.04.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
GB | 13.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/29] | FI | 31.12.2008 | |
IE | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
GB | 13.07.2009 | ||
BE | 31.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | FI | 31.12.2008 | |
IE | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
GB | 13.07.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | FI | 31.12.2008 | |
IE | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
CH | 31.07.2009 | ||
LI | 31.07.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2010/11] | FI | 31.12.2008 | |
IE | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
MC | 31.07.2009 | ||
Former [2009/47] | FI | 31.12.2008 | |
IE | 31.12.2008 | ||
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/37] | FI | 31.12.2008 | |
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
SE | 31.03.2009 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
PT | 01.06.2009 | ||
Former [2009/33] | FI | 31.12.2008 | |
NL | 31.12.2008 | ||
ES | 11.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/25] | FI | 31.12.2008 | |
NL | 31.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4996833 (VON ALLOWERDEN WILHELM [DE]) [X] 1-3,5,8,11-15 * page 4, column 1, line 37 - line 66 * * page 4, column 2, line 65 - page 5, column 4, line 51; figures 1,2 * * the whole document * [Y] 4,9,10,16; | [Y]WO9202690 (NUSSER JOSEF [DE]) [Y] 10 * page 7 - page 8 *; | [X]US5111636 (QUIRIN MICHEL [FR]) [X] 6,7 * abstract ** page 26, column 4, line 38 - line 65 *; | [X]EP0838146 (LELY NV C VAN DER [NL]) [X] 6,7 * abstract * * page 8, column 13, line 21 - line 29 * * page 9, column 16, line 28 - page 10, column 17, line 22 *; | [X]DE19716379 (KRONE BERNHARD GMBH MASCHF [DE]) [X] 6,7 * abstract * * page 5, column 7, line 21 - line 41 *; | [XY]EP0937382 (NIEMEYER LANDMASCH GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3-5,11-15 * the whole document * * page 2, column 2, line 52 - page 3, column 3, line 12; figures 4-6 * [Y] 4,9,16 | by applicant | EP0672336 |