EP1174170 - Filter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.07.2008 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.08.2008 [2008/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kyosan Denki Co., Ltd. Oaza Okazato 11-3, Sowa-machi, Sashima-gun Ibaraki-pref., 306 / JP | [2007/32] |
Former [2002/04] | For all designated states Kyosan Denki Co., Ltd. Oaza Okazato 11-3, Sowa-machi Sashima-gun, Ibaraki-pref., 306 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kouichi, Ito, c/o Kyosan Denki Co., Ltd. Oaza Okazato 11-3 Sowa-machi Sashima-gun, Ibaraki-pref., 306 / JP | 02 /
Takashi, Arai, c/o Kyosan Denki Co., Ltd. Oaza Okazato 11-3 Sowa-machi Sashima-gun, Ibaraki-pref., 306 / JP | 03 /
Hideo, Kamo, c/o Kyosan Denki Co., Ltd. Oaza Okazato 11-3 Sowa-machi Sashima-gun, Ibaraki-pref., 306 / JP | [2007/33] |
Former [2007/31] | 01 /
Kouichi, Ito, c/o Kyosan Denki Co., Ltd. 11-3, Oaza Okazato, Sowa-machi Sashima-gun, Ibaraki-pref., 306 / JP | ||
02 /
Takashi, Arai, c/o Kyosan Denki Co., Ltd. 11-3, Oaza Okazato, Sowa-machi Sashima-gun, Ibaraki-pref., 306 / JP | |||
03 /
Hideo, Kamo, c/o Kyosan Denki Co., Ltd. 11-3, Oaza Okazato, Sowa-machi Sashima-gun, Ibaraki-pref., 306 / JP | |||
Former [2002/04] | 01 /
Kouichi, Ito, c/o Kyosan Denki Co., Ltd. 11-3, Oaza Olazato, Sowa-machi Sashima-gun, Ibaraki-pref. 306 / JP | ||
02 /
Takashi, Arai, c/o Kyosan Denki Co., Ltd. 11-3, Oaza Olazato, Sowa-machi Sashima-gun, Ibaraki-pref. 306 / JP | |||
03 /
Hideo, Kamo, c/o Kyosan Denki Co., Ltd. 11-3, Oaza Olazato, Sowa-machi Sashima-gun, Ibaraki-pref. 306 / JP | Representative(s) | Winter, Brandl - Partnerschaft mbB Alois-Steinecker-Straße 22 85354 Freising / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/04] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 01117298.8 | 17.07.2001 | [2002/04] | Priority number, date | JP20000217980 | 18.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000217980 | [2002/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1174170 | Date: | 23.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1174170 | Date: | 02.01.2003 | [2003/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1174170 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B01D35/027, F02M37/22 | [2002/04] | CPC: |
B01D35/0273 (EP,US);
B01D27/06 (KR);
F02M37/34 (EP,US);
F02M37/50 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2003/39] |
Former [2002/04] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Filter | [2002/04] | English: | Filter | [2002/04] | French: | Filtre | [2002/04] | Examination procedure | 01.07.2003 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/38] | 02.07.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 22.10.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, IT, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | 03.11.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 06.08.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2003 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2003 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | 06.08.2003 | TR   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3480149 (HOUSER ROBERT L) [X] 1-3,11,12 * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 64; figure 3 *; | [X]US4600511 (SHERMAN VICTOR L [US], et al) [X] 1* column 4, line 35 - column 5, line 9; figure 2 *; | [X]US4804466 (COOPER RICHARD D [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5 * column 2, line 52 - column 4, line 60; figures 2,3,7,8 *; | [X]US4869816 (MARKL NORBERT [CA]) [X] 1-3,5 * column 2, line 48 - column 4, line 46; figure 3 *; | [XY]US5494575 (KITAJIMA KYOJI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3,7,10,11,13,15,16,19 * column 3, line 40 - column 4, line 44 * * column 5, line 60 - column 6, line 47; figures 1,3,6 * [Y] 23; | [Y]EP0743445 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [Y] 23 * column 3, line 12 - column 4, line 47; figure 3 * |