EP1277644 - Trailer for a perambulator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.02.2009 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lamprecht AG Birchstrasse 183 8050 Zürich / CH | [2003/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Haeggberg, Christian Mühlaustrasse 42 9602 Bazenheid / CH | [2003/04] | Representative(s) | Müller, Christoph Emanuel, et al Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2003/04] | Müller, Christoph Emanuel, et al Hepp, Wenger & Ryffel AG, Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | Application number, filing date | 01117499.2 | 20.07.2001 | [2003/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1277644 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1277644 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B62B9/28, B62K27/12 | [2003/04] | CPC: |
B62B9/28 (EP,US);
B62B5/0026 (EP,US);
B62B5/085 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/04] | Title | German: | Kinderwagenanhänger | [2003/04] | English: | Trailer for a perambulator | [2003/04] | French: | Remorque pour voiture d'enfant | [2003/04] | Examination procedure | 12.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/37] | 10.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.07.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.04.2008 | IE | 02.04.2008 | TR | 02.04.2008 | GR | 03.07.2008 | MC | 31.07.2008 | PT | 02.09.2008 | [2010/47] |
Former [2010/37] | CY | 02.04.2008 | |
IE | 02.04.2008 | ||
TR | 02.04.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
PT | 02.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/42] | CY | 02.04.2008 | |
IE | 02.04.2008 | ||
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
PT | 02.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/18] | IE | 02.04.2008 | |
MC | 31.07.2008 | ||
PT | 02.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | IE | 02.04.2008 | |
PT | 02.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | PT | 02.09.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3000645 (SCHMIDT CARL O) [Y] 1-4,10,12-14,16,21-23 * column W *; | [Y]GB1346032 (BYGG OCH TRANSPORTEKONOMIE AB) [Y] 20* page 2, line 3 - page 2, line 7; figure 1 *; | [Y]US5653460 (FOGARTY MARGARET A [IE]) [Y] 1-3,5,6,8,12,13,16 * column W *; | [Y]GB2328907 (FERGUSON DAVID ARTHUR [GB]) [Y] 1,4,5,7-12,14,16-23 * the whole document *; | [Y]DE29916012U (POTTHAST IVO [DE]) [Y] 1-14,16-23 * the whole document * |