EP1277428 - Coffee machine foreseen for a car [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.07.2006 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 1800 Vevey / CH | [2005/37] |
Former [2003/04] | For all designated states SOCIETE DES PRODUITS NESTLE S.A. Case postale 353 1800 Vevey / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kollep, Alexandre Chemin des Chenes 25 1095 Lutry / CH | [2003/04] | Representative(s) | Borne, Patrice Daniel, et al Nestec S.A. Centre de Recherche Nestlé Vers-chez-les-Blanc Case Postale 44 1000 Lausanne 26 / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2004/33] | Borne, Patrice Daniel, et al Avenue Nestlé 55 1800 Vevey / CH | ||
Former [2003/04] | Thomas, Alain 55, avenue Nestlé 1800 Vevey / CH | Application number, filing date | 01117588.2 | 20.07.2001 | [2003/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1277428 | Date: | 22.01.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1277428 | Date: | 14.09.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/00 | [2003/04] | CPC: |
A47J31/545 (EP,US);
A47J31/005 (EP,US);
A47J31/3633 (EP,US);
A47J31/3642 (EP,US);
B60N3/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2003/04] | Extension states | SI | 22.07.2003 | Title | German: | Kaffeemaschine für ein Automobil | [2003/04] | English: | Coffee machine foreseen for a car | [2003/04] | French: | Machine à café prévue pour une voiture | [2003/04] | Examination procedure | 22.07.2003 | Examination requested [2003/38] | 26.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.04.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 14.09.2005 | FI | 14.09.2005 | TR | 14.09.2005 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/37] | FI | 14.09.2005 | |
TR | 14.09.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 14.09.2005 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1564088 (HOUILLE ET MÉJANÈS) [A] 5* figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0496940 (RICERCA ELETTROMECCANICA SRL [IT]) [Y] 7,8 * column 2, lines 5-50; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO9525457 (COFFEA SA [CH], et al) [A] 3,8 * page 3, paragraph 1; figure 1 *; | [XA]WO9534236 (ENGLISH PHILIP H [US]) [X] 11 * page 15, lines 9-18; figures 1,3 * * abstract * [A] 1; | [Y]US5992298 (ILLY FRANCESCO [CH], et al) [Y] 7,8 * abstract * * figures 1,5 * * column 6, lines 21-38 *; | [DX]US6062127 (KLOSINSKI BOGUSLAW [US], et al) [DX] 12 * claim 11 *; | [A]US6098525 (GIJZEL JACOBUS M [NL], et al) [A] 1,9,10 * column 3, lines 12-25; figure 1 * | by applicant | EP0512468 | EP0512470 | US6062127 |