EP1177985 - Oxygen absorbent composition absorbing water vapor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.11.2005 [2005/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8324 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/06] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL COMPANY, INC. 5-2, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-8324 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Himeshima, Tomoharu, Tokyo Research Laboratory Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Co. Inc., 6-1-1, Niijuku Katushika-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Aoyama, Nahomi, Tokyo Research Laboratory Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Co. Inc., 6-1-1, Niijuku Katushika-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Nito, Syoichi, Tokyo Research Laboratory Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Co. Inc., 6-1-1, Niijuku Katushika-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Tomita, Kazuyuki, Tokyo Research Laboratory Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Co. Inc., 6-1-1, Niijuku Katushika-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Baba, Junko, Tokyo Research Laboratory Mitsubishi Gas Chemical Co. Inc., 6-1-1, Niijuku Katushika-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2002/06] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/06] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01117631.0 | 24.07.2001 | [2002/06] | Priority number, date | JP20000221694 | 24.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000221694 | [2002/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1177985 | Date: | 06.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1177985 | Date: | 19.11.2003 | [2003/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1177985 | Date: | 08.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2003 | Classification | IPC: | B65D81/26, A23L1/303 | [2002/06] | CPC: |
A23L3/3436 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2004/33] |
Former [2002/06] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Sauerstoff und Wasserdampf absorbierende Zusammensetzung | [2002/06] | English: | Oxygen absorbent composition absorbing water vapor | [2002/06] | French: | Composition pour l'absorption d'oxigène et de la vapeur d'eau | [2002/06] | Examination procedure | 09.03.2004 | Examination requested [2004/19] | 14.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5274024 (KOYAMA MASAYASU [JP], et al) [A] 1-5 * column 4, lines 1-35 *; | [A]FR2689769 (DEBOFFLES REGIS [FR], et al) [A] 1-5 * page 1, line 19 - page 2, line 8 *; | [A]EP0884173 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [A] 1-5 * example 1 * |