EP1176165 - Resin composition for sliding member and sliding member using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.01.2007 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.02.2007 [2007/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OILES CORPORATION 3-2 Shiba-Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/11] |
Former [2002/05] | For all designated states OILES CORPORATION 3-2 Shiba-Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirai, Kazuo 1015, Tokiwa Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [2002/05] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/05] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 01117677.3 | 26.07.2001 | [2002/05] | Priority number, date | JP20000228208 | 28.07.2000 Original published format: JP 2000228208 | [2002/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1176165 | Date: | 30.01.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1176165 | Date: | 15.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.09.2001 | Classification | IPC: | C08K5/09, C08K5/098, C08K5/521, C08K3/32, C08K5/01, C10M107/32, C10M123/02, C10M169/00, F16C33/00 | [2002/05] | CPC: |
F16C33/201 (EP,US);
C08L101/00 (KR);
C08K3/32 (EP,US);
C08K5/01 (EP,US);
C08K5/09 (EP,US);
C08K5/098 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K3/32, C08L67/00 (EP,US);
C08K5/01, C08L67/00 (US,EP);
C08K5/098, C08L67/00 (US,EP);
C08K5/09, C08L67/00 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/42] |
Former [2002/05] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR | Title | German: | Harzzusammensetzung für Gleitelement und Gleitelement daraus | [2002/05] | English: | Resin composition for sliding member and sliding member using the same | [2002/05] | French: | Composition de résine pour élément de glissage et élément de glissage | [2002/05] | Examination procedure | 10.01.2002 | Examination requested [2002/12] | 30.09.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]JPS6245662 ; | [Y]JPS5528562 ; | [A]JPS55157660 ; | [A]JPH01170691 ; | [DA]GB1237591 (OILES INDUSTRY CO LTD [JP]) [DA] 1-12 * claims 1-5 *; | [A]EP0146140 (HITACHI LTD [JP]) [A] 1-12 * claims 1-5 *; | JPS6284188 [ ] (KUBOTA LTD, et al); | [A]EP0340931 (POLYPLASTICS CO [JP]) [A] 1-12 * claims 1,5 *; | [A]EP0431594 (OJI PAPER CO [JP]) [A] 1-10 * claims 1,8,12 *; | [Y]US5156756 (KOJIMA TAKESHI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-12 * claims 1,3,7 *; | [A]EP0747444 (OTSUKA KAGAKU KK [JP]) [A] 1-12 * claims 1,6 *; | [PA]EP1097967 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [PA] 1-10 * claims 1,4 * * page 6, lines 2,3,19,31 * * page 7, lines 1,6 * * page 8, lines 1,58 *; | [DY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870729), vol. 011, no. 232, Database accession no. (C - 437), & JP62045662 A 19870227 (OILES IND CO LTD) [DY] 1-12 * abstract * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19800430), vol. 004, no. 058, Database accession no. (P - 009), & JP55028562 A 19800229 (HITACHI MAXELL LTD) [Y] 1-12 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19810225), vol. 005, no. 031, Database accession no. (C - 045), & JP55157660 A 19801208 (TOYODA GOSEI CO LTD) [A] 1-12 * abstract * | [A] - NAGAO, SHOZO ET AL, "Lubricating greases for pipe fitting", CHEMABS, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 107:10253, URL: STN, XP002176388 [A] 1-10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891003), vol. 013, no. 442, Database accession no. (C - 641), & JP01170691 A 19890705 (SHOWA SHELL SEKIYU KK) [A] 1-12 * abstract * |