Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1176570
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
28.08.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] |
07.01.2005 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 23.02.2005 [2005/08] |
20.09.2004 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.07.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.06.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.04.2004 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.01.2004 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
28.01.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.12.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
01.10.2003 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
02.09.2003 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
31.07.2003 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
21.03.2003 |
First examination report |
|
19.03.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
05.03.2003 |
Change - extension states |
|
15.11.2002 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 02.01.2003 [2003/01] |
18.10.2002 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.12.2002 [2002/49] |
11.10.2002 |
Change - extension states |
|
15.02.2002 |
Publication of search report |
published on 03.04.2002 [2002/14] |
15.02.2002 |
Change - classification |
published on 03.04.2002 [2002/14] |
14.12.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 30.01.2002 [2002/05] |